EP1697280 - METHODS FOR CARBON ISOTOPE LABELING SYNTHESIS OF KETONES AND AMINES BY SUZUKI COUPLING REACTIONS USING CARBON-ISOTOPE MONOXIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont, Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAHMAN, Obaidur Uppsala University Thorildsgatan 10 751 24 Uppsala / SE | 02 /
LANGSTROM, Bengt Uppsala Research Imaging Solutions AB Akademiska sjukhset S-751-85 Uppsala / SE | 03 /
KIHLBERG, Tor Uppsala Research Imaging Solutions AB Akademiska sjukhset S-751-85 Uppsala / SE | 04 /
LLOP, Jordi Edificio Hospital del Mar Passeig Maritim 25-59 08003 Barcelona / ES | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al Global Patent Operations Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/49] | Szary, Anne Catherine GE International Inc. GPO Europe The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | ||
Former [2013/23] | Bannan, Sally, et al GE Healthcare Limited Pollards Wood Nightingales Lane Chalfont St Giles Buckinghamshire HP8 4SP / GB | ||
Former [2013/16] | Bryan, Ian Bennett, et al GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont, Bucks. HP7 9NA / GB | ||
Former [2006/36] | Hammett, Audrey Grace Campbell, et al GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont Bucks. HP7 9NA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04806383.8 | 20.12.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004IB04199 | Priority number, date | US20030532606P | 24.12.2003 Original published format: US 532606 P | [2006/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005066100 | Date: | 21.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1697280 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07B59/00, A61K51/00 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
C07B59/00 (EP,US);
A61P41/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KOHLENSTOFFISOTOPMARKIERENDEN SYNTHESE VON KETONEN UND AMINEN DURCH SUZUKI-KUPPLUNGSREAKTIONEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON KOHLENSTOFFISOTOPMONOXID | [2006/36] | English: | METHODS FOR CARBON ISOTOPE LABELING SYNTHESIS OF KETONES AND AMINES BY SUZUKI COUPLING REACTIONS USING CARBON-ISOTOPE MONOXIDE | [2006/36] | French: | PROCEDES PERMETTANT DE SYNTHETISER, PAR MARQUAGE DES ISOTOPES DU CARBONE, DES CETONES ET DES AMINES AU MOYEN DE REACTIONS DE COUPLAGE SUZUKI UTILISANT UN MONOXYDE D'ISOTOPE DU CARBONE | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 17.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/49] | 29.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DXY] - S.K. ZEISLER ET.AL., "CONVERSION OF NO-CARRIER ADDED [11C]CABON DIOXIDE TO [11C]CABON MONOXIDE ON MOLYBDENUM FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF 11C-LABELLED AROMATIC KETONES", APPL. RADIAT. ISOT., (1997), vol. 48, no. 8, pages 1091 - 1095, XP002326941 [DX] 1-13,17 * page 1093, left column, paragraph "syntesis of [11C]benzophenone"; page 1094 reaction scheme; Figure 1; * [Y] 14,15,19-23 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0969-8043(97)00109-7 | [DXY] - CECILE PERRIO-HUARD ET. AL., "REDUCTIVE AMINATION OF CARBOXYLIC ACIDS AND [11C]MAGNESIUM HALIDE CARBOXYLATES", J. CHEM. SOC. PERKIN TRANS. 1, (2000), pages 311 - 316, XP002326942 [DX] 16,18 * page 312, right column, last paragraph; page 313, table 2; page 313, scheme 3; * [Y] 14,15,19-23 | [DXY] - PELLE LIDSTRÖM ET.AL., "[11C]CARBON MONOXIDE IN THE PALLADIUM-MEDIATED SYNTHESIS OF [11C]-LABELLED KETONES", J. CHEM. SOC. PERKIN TRANS. 1, (1997), pages 2701 - 2706, XP002326943 [DX] 13 * page 2702, table 1; pabe 2705, right column, last paragraph - page 2706, left column third paragraph; * [Y] 19-23 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/a703062b |