EP1703512 - FILE MANAGEMENT DEVICE AND FILE MANAGEMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2010 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMITA, Nobuyoshi, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 1410001 / JP | [2006/38] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04806960.3 | 13.12.2004 | [2006/38] | WO2004JP18599 | Priority number, date | JP20040002515 | 07.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004002515 | [2006/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005066960 | Date: | 21.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1703512 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/00, G11B27/034, G11B20/10, G11B20/12 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
G11B20/10 (EP,KR,US);
G11B20/12 (KR);
G11B27/00 (KR);
G11B27/034 (EP,KR,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/24 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2529 (EP,US);
Y10S707/914 (US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/15] |
Former [2006/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATEIVERWALTUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND DATEIVERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN | [2006/38] | English: | FILE MANAGEMENT DEVICE AND FILE MANAGEMENT METHOD | [2006/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GESTION DE FICHIERS ET PROCEDE DE GESTION DE FICHIERS | [2006/38] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2005 | Translation filed | 26.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2005 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 01.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/03] | 06.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2000083217 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [A]JP2001075856 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2001103424 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN); | [A]JP2003100018 (SONY CORP); | [X]WO03083869 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) |