EP1698600 - INTERMEDIATE FILM FOR LAMINATED GLASS AND LAMINATED GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 4-4, Nishitemma 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8565 / JP | [2020/17] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 4-4, Nishitemma 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8565 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKATANI, Juichi Sekisui Chemical Co. Ltd 1259 Izumi Minakuchicho Koka-shi Shiga 528-8585 / JP | 02 /
HATTA, Bungo Sekisui Chemical Co. Ltd 1259 Izumi Minakuchicho Koka-shi Shiga 528-8585 / JP | [2020/17] |
Former [2007/01] | 01 /
FUKATANI, Juichi Sekisui Chemical Co. Ltd 1259 Izumi Minakuchicho Koka-shi Shiga 528-8585 / JP | ||
02 /
HATTA, Bungo Sekisui Chemical Co. Ltd 1259 Izumi Minakuchicho Koka-shi Shiga 528-8585 / JP | |||
Former [2006/36] | 01 /
FUKATANI, Juichi Sekisui Chemical Co. Ltd 1259 Izumi Minakuchicho Koba-shi Shiga 528-8585 / JP | ||
02 /
HATTA, Bungo Sekisui Chemical Co. Ltd 1259 Izumi Minakuchicho Koba-shi Shiga 528-8585 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/17] |
Former [2006/36] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04807022.1 | 14.12.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004JP18663 | Priority number, date | JP20030432891 | 26.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003432891 | [2006/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005066094 | Date: | 21.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1698600 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1698600 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C03C27/12, B32B17/10 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
B32B17/10761 (EP,KR,US);
C03C27/10 (KR);
B32B17/10 (KR);
B32B17/10036 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/10165 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/10174 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/10633 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/10678 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/10688 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/10853 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/18 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2250/03 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2250/40 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2264/102 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/102 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/412 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/422 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/71 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2419/00 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2605/006 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/256 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3163 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31942 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31946 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2020/17] |
Former [2007/14] | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ZWISCHENFOLIE FÜR VERBUNDGLAS UND VERBUNDGLAS | [2006/36] | English: | INTERMEDIATE FILM FOR LAMINATED GLASS AND LAMINATED GLASS | [2006/36] | French: | COUCHE MINCE INTERMEDIAIRE POUR VERRE STRATIFIE ET VERRE STRATIFIE | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2006 | Translation filed | 08.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 08.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 02.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 09.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0727306 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 17 - column 7, line 45; examples 2,14,15 *; | [A]JP2002326846 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 5 * abstract *; | [XI]US2002182422 (GARRETT PAUL D [US], et al) [X] 16 * paragraph [0144] - paragraph [0160]; examples 6,9; table 1 * [I] 1,3-7,14-15; | WO03018502 [ ] (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP], et al); | [IP]EP1419999 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [IP] 1-7,14-16 * example -; claim - *; | [E]EP1529632 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [E] 1-2,4,6-7 * examples 1-3; claims 1,2,3,5,6,8 * | International search | [X]JPS6152093B ; | [X]JPH11171604 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [Y]JP2000281934 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND); | [X]JP2003252655 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) | Examination | JP2001039741 | by applicant | JPH06436442 | JPH06152093 | JP2001302289 | JP2002007583 | US2002182422 | JP2003252655 | EP1419999 |