EP1705736 - NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | For all designated states Mitsubishi Plastics, Inc. 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8252 / JP | [2015/31] |
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI PLASTICS, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | |||
Former [2006/49] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI PLASTICS INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | |||
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI PLASTICS INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | |||
For all designated states Nakashima, Satoshi C/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science and Technology Research Center, Inc., 8-3-1, Chuo, Ami-machi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki 3000332 / JP | |||
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 33-8, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI PLASTICS INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | |||
For all designated states Nakashima, Satoshi C/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science and Technology Research Center, Inc., 8-3-1, Chuo, Ami-machi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki 3000332 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKASHIMA, Satoshi, c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science And Tech. Res. Center, Inc. 8-3-1, Chuo Ami-machi, Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki 3000332 / JP | 02 /
USAMI, Yasushi, c/o Nagahama Plant Mitsubishi Plastics, Inc. 5-8, Mitsuya-cho Nagahama-shi, Shiga 5268660 / JP | 03 /
SAKAI, Akihiko, c/o Nagahama Plant Mitsubishi Plastics, Inc. 5-8, Mitsuya-cho Nagahama-shi, Shiga 5268660 / JP | 04 /
HAYASHI, Manabu, c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp. 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 1080014 / JP | 05 /
KATO, Ryoichi, c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science And Tech. Res. Center, Inc. 8-3-1, Chuo Ami-machi, Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki 3000332 / JP | [2015/35] |
Former [2006/49] | 01 /
NAKASHIMA, Satoshi, c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science And Tech. Res. Center, Inc., 8-3-1, Chuo Ami-machi, Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki 3000332 / JP | ||
02 /
USAMI, Yasushi, c/o Nagahama Plant Mitsubishi Plastics, Inc., 5-8, Mitsuya-cho Nagahama-shi, Shiga 5268660 / JP | |||
03 /
SAKAI, Akihiko, c/o Nagahama Plant Mitsubishi Plastics, Inc., 5-8, Mitsuya-cho Nagahama-shi, Shiga 5268660 / JP | |||
04 /
HAYASHI, Manabu, c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp. 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 1080014 / JP | |||
05 /
KATO, Ryoichi, c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science And Tech. Res. Center, Inc., 8-3-1, Chuo Ami-machi, Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki 3000332 / JP | |||
Former [2006/39] | 01 /
NAKASHIMA, Satoshi, c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science And Tech. Res. Center, Inc., 8-3-1, Chuo Ami-machi, Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki 3000332 / JP | ||
02 /
USAMI, Yasushi, c/o Nagahama Plant Mitsubishi Plastics, Inc., 5-8, Mitsuya-cho Nagahama-shi, Shiga 5268660 / JP | |||
03 /
SAKAI, Akihiko, c/o Nagahama Plant Mitsubishi Plastics, Inc., 5-8, Mitsuya-cho Nagahama-shi, Shiga 5268660 / JP | |||
04 /
HAYASHI, Manabu, c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp. 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 1080014 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2015/35] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/39] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04807342.3 | 14.12.2004 | [2006/39] | WO2004JP18985 | Priority number, date | JP20030416762 | 15.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003416762 | JP20030416761 | 15.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003416761 | JP20040033619 | 10.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004033619 | JP20040033617 | 10.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004033617 | JP20040033618 | 10.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004033618 | [2006/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005057690 | Date: | 23.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1705736 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1705736 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/16, H01M10/0525, // H01M4/02, H01M4/525, H01M4/587, H01M10/0567, H01M10/0568, H01M10/0569, H01M10/42 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M50/446 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/05 (KR);
H01M4/02 (KR);
H01M4/48 (KR);
H01M4/587 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/449 (KR);
H01M50/463 (KR);
H01M50/489 (KR);
H01M10/0567 (EP,US);
H01M10/0568 (EP,US);
H01M10/0569 (EP,US);
H01M10/4235 (EP,US);
H01M2004/021 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2300/0037 (EP,US);
H01M4/525 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR);
Y02P70/50 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/50] | H01M2/16, H01M4/02, H01M10/40, // H01M4/48, H01M4/58 | ||
Former IPC [2006/39] | H01M2/16, H01M4/02, H01M4/48, H01M4/58, H01M10/40 | Designated contracting states | DE [2015/35] |
Former [2007/12] | DE | ||
Former [2006/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT WASSERFREIEM ELEKTROLYT | [2006/39] | English: | NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY | [2006/39] | French: | ACCUMULATEUR SECONDAIRE A ELECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX | [2006/39] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2006 | Translation filed | 04.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/39] | 13.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12162645.1 / EP2472636 | EP12162649.3 / EP2472637 | EP12162653.5 / EP2472638 | EP12162659.2 / EP2472639 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08217451 (TOSOH CORP) [A] 1-3* abstract *; | [X]WO9859384 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-19 * page 2, line 28 - page 5, line 9 * * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 6 * * page 10, line 15 - line 22 * * claims 1-11 *; | [A]EP0918040 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-19 * page 3, paragraph 11 * * page 4, paragraphs 28,29 * * page 8, paragraph 82 * * page 9, paragraph 88 - page 20; tables 1-6 * * figures 3,4 *; | [X]JP2002088188 (ASAHI KASEI CORP) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0023] * * table 1 *; | [X]JP2002128928 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * claims 1-7 * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0045]; table 1 *; | [X]US6627346 (KINOUCHI MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-19 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH04101357 (HITACHI MAXELL); | [A]JPH0513062 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS); | [A]JPH05226004 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [A]JP2000030686 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [A]JP2001213615 (MITSUI MINING CO LTD); | [A]JP2002025615 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV); | [A]JP2003017050 (SANTOKU CORP); | [A]JP2003086248 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [A]JP2003217658 (YUASA BATTERY CO LTD); | [A]JP2003331825 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |