EP1705346 - PLASMA INJECTOR, EXHAUST GAS PURIFYING SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR INJECTING REDUCING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2006/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRATA, Hirohito, TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyotacho Toyota-shi, Aichi 4718571 / JP | 02 /
MATSUMURA, Eriko, TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyotacho Toyota-shi, Aichi 4718571 / JP | [2011/39] |
Former [2006/39] | 01 /
HIRATA, Hirohito, TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyotacho Toyota-shi, Aichi 4718571 / JP | ||
02 /
MATSUMURA, Eriko, TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyotacho Toyota-shi, Aichi 4718571 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2011/39] |
Former [2006/39] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04807484.3 | 15.12.2004 | [2006/39] | WO2004JP19127 | Priority number, date | JP20030421358 | 18.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003421358 | [2006/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005059325 | Date: | 30.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1705346 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1705346 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/08, F01N3/36, F01N3/20 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
F01N3/36 (EP,US);
B01D53/90 (EP,US);
B01D53/925 (EP,US);
F01N3/2066 (EP,US);
B01D2259/818 (EP,US);
F01N2240/28 (EP,US);
F01N2570/14 (EP,US);
F01N2610/03 (EP,US);
F01N2610/1453 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/39] | F01N3/08, F01N3/36, F02M51/06, F02M69/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/13] |
Former [2006/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PLASMAINJEKTOR, ABGASREINIGUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM EINSPRITZEN VON REDUKTIONSMITTEL | [2006/39] | English: | PLASMA INJECTOR, EXHAUST GAS PURIFYING SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR INJECTING REDUCING AGENT | [2006/39] | French: | INJECTEUR DE PLASMA, SYSTEME DE PURIFICATION DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT ET PROCEDE SERVANT A INJECTER UN AGENT REDUCTEUR | [2006/39] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2006 | Translation filed | 16.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 16.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/39] | 26.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19510804 (DORNIER GMBH [DE]) [X] 8-9 * column 5, line 13 - line 27; figure 1 *; | [Y]US6340015 (BENEDIKT WALTER [DE], et al) [Y] 2,4 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2002061556 (NAGANO SHIGERU) [Y] 3* abstract *; | [XY]WO02064954 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1,5-9 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4; | [Y]US2003111042 (RIEGER FRANZ [DE], et al) [Y] 2,4 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0029]; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JP2003529012 ; | [Y]JP2002061556 (NAGANO SHIGERU); | [Y]JP2001317360 (NAGANO SHIGERU); | [A]JP2002233733 (TOSHIBA CORP) | by applicant | WO02064954 | US2003111042 |