EP1696034 - NOVEL METHOD OF NUCLEIC ACID TRANSFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd. 6-8, Dosho-machi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8524 / JP | For all designated states KOKEN CO., Ltd. 14-3, Mejiro 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171-0031 / JP | For all designated states National Cancer Center 1-1 Tsukigi 5-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | For all designated states Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd. 6-8, Dosho-machi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8524 / JP | ||
For all designated states KOKEN CO., LTD. 14-3, Mejiro 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171-0031 / JP | |||
For all designated states National Cancer Center 1-1 Tsukigi 5-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | |||
Former [2010/17] | For all designated states Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd. 6-8, Dosho-machi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8524 / JP | ||
For all designated states KOKEN CO., LTD. 14-3, Mejiro 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171-0031 / JP | |||
For all designated states Japan as Represented by President of National Cancer Center 1-1, Tsukiji 5-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | |||
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd. 6-8, Dosho-machi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8524 / JP | ||
For all designated states KOKEN CO., LTD. 14-3, Mejiro 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINAKUCHI, Yoshiko Dainippon Sumimoto Phar.Co., Ltd 3-45, Kurakakiuchi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0878 / JP | 02 /
OCHIYA, Takahiro 1-1, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 1040045 / JP | [2006/35] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04807517.0 | 15.12.2004 | [2006/35] | WO2004JP19160 | Priority number, date | JP20030423004 | 19.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003423004 | [2006/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005061717 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1696034 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/63 | [2006/35] | CPC: |
C12N15/1136 (EP,US);
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
C12N2320/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUES VERFAHREN ZUM NUKLEINSÄURETRANSFER | [2006/35] | English: | NOVEL METHOD OF NUCLEIC ACID TRANSFER | [2006/35] | French: | METHODE DE TRANSFERT D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE | [2006/35] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2006 | Translation filed | 14.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 24.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/34] | 03.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.02.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9614424 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB], et al) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [XA]EP0779362 (APPLIED RESEARCH SYSTEMS [AN]) [X] 14-19,21 * page 11, line 31 - line 33 * [A] 1-13,20; | [XA] - GRAHAM F L ET AL, "TRANSFORMATION OF RAT CELLS BY DNA OF HUMAN ADENOVIRUS 5", VIROLOGY, (1973), vol. 54, no. 2, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 536 - 539, XP002406446 [X] 14-19 * page 536, column 2, line 1 - line 14 * [A] 1-13,20,21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-6822(73)90163-3 | [A] - MANDEL M ET AL, "CALCIUM DEPENDENT BACTERIO PHAGE DNA INFECTION", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1970), vol. 53, no. 1, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 159 - 162, XP009074397 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2836(70)90051-3 | [A] - MORRISON D A, "TRANSFORMATION IN ESCHERICHIA-COLI CRYOGENIC PRESERVATION OF COMPETENT CELLS", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1977), vol. 132, no. 1, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 349 - 351, XP002406447 [A] 1-21 * page 349, column 1, paragraph 2 * | International search | [X]JPH01157388 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [X]JPH0491783 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [X]WO0073414 (KOCAGOEZ TANIL [TR], et al); | [X]JP2001335512 (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD); | [A]WO0197857 (SUMITOMO PHARMA [JP], et al); | [X]JP2002325572 (UNIV OSAKA); | [X]JP2003274950 (UNIV OSAKA); | [A] - HONMA K. ET AL, "Atelocollagen-based gene transfer in cells allows high-throughput screening of gene functions", BIOCHEM.BIOPHYS.RES.COMMUN., (2001), vol. 289, no. 5, pages 1075 - 1081, XP002957375 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.2001.6133 | [A] - OCHIYA T. ET AL, "Tennen Kobunshi ni yoru Idenshi Vector no Atarashii Unpan System", EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (1999), vol. 17, no. 17, pages 2288 - 2291 |