EP1698718 - ACRYLIC SHRINKABLE FIBER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIDA, Sohei 2-63, Takasago-cho Okihama-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 6760026 / JP | 02 /
KAWAMURA, Kohei 1-25-55-201, Marutsuka, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512143 / JP | 03 /
KURODA, Minoru 448-1-407, Aboshi-ku Waku, Himeji-shi, Hyogo 6711227 / JP | 04 /
MIHOICHI, Masahiko 2-23-9, Nakazato-cho, Kita-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6511103 / JP | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/36] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04808075.8 | 24.12.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004JP19725 | Priority number, date | JP20030435851 | 26.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003435851 | [2006/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005064050 | Date: | 14.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1698718 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1698718 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/54 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
D01F6/48 (EP,US);
D01F6/54 (EP,KR,US);
D10B2321/10 (KR);
D10B2401/14 (KR);
Y10T428/2904 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2929 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHRUMPFÄHIGE ACRYLFASER UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2006/36] | English: | ACRYLIC SHRINKABLE FIBER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2006/36] | French: | FIBRE RETRECISSABLE ACRYLIQUE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIE | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2006 | Translation filed | 12.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 27.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.04.2009 | BE | 22.04.2009 | CY | 22.04.2009 | CZ | 22.04.2009 | DK | 22.04.2009 | EE | 22.04.2009 | FI | 22.04.2009 | IT | 22.04.2009 | LT | 22.04.2009 | NL | 22.04.2009 | PL | 22.04.2009 | RO | 22.04.2009 | SI | 22.04.2009 | SK | 22.04.2009 | TR | 22.04.2009 | BG | 22.07.2009 | SE | 22.07.2009 | GR | 23.07.2009 | ES | 02.08.2009 | IS | 22.08.2009 | PT | 22.08.2009 | HU | 23.10.2009 | GB | 24.12.2009 | IE | 24.12.2009 | LU | 24.12.2009 | CH | 31.12.2009 | FR | 31.12.2009 | LI | 31.12.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
BE | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
IT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
HU | 23.10.2009 | ||
GB | 24.12.2009 | ||
IE | 24.12.2009 | ||
LU | 24.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
BE | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
IT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
GB | 24.12.2009 | ||
IE | 24.12.2009 | ||
LU | 24.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
BE | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
IT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
GB | 24.12.2009 | ||
IE | 24.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
BE | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
GB | 24.12.2009 | ||
IE | 24.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
BE | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
IE | 24.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
BE | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
IE | 24.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
BE | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
BE | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PL | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | LT | 22.04.2009 | |
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | ES | 02.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3963790 (COUCHOUD PAUL) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US4287148 (CAZZARO GIORGIO, et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US4336214 (REINEHR ULRICH, et al) [A] 1-8* example 6 *; | [A]JPS6452813 (KANEBO LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS55163207 (HOECHST AG); | [A]JPS6342911 (KANEBO LTD); | [A]JPS6452812 (KANEBO LTD); | [A]JPS6452813 (KANEBO LTD); | [A]JPH06158422 (KANEBO LTD); | [A]JP2001303364 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND) |