19.11.2010 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] |
31.07.2010 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.01.2010 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.06.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.06.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.02.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.10.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.09.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.08.2008 |
First examination report |
|
29.07.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.05.2008 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] |
30.05.2008 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] |
30.05.2008 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] |
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.12.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.03.2007 |
Change - designated states |
published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] |
30.03.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] |
20.12.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.09.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.09.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.11.2006 [2006/44] |
29.09.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.11.2006 [2006/44] |
25.10.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.10.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.10.2005 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
18.08.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.08.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.03.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|