EP1726015 - RECORDING MEDIUM WITH PHYSICAL ACCESS CONTROL (PAC) INFORMATION THEREON AND APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR FORMING, RECORDING, AND REPRODUCING THE RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. LG Twin Towers 20, Yeouido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. LG Twin Towers 20, Yeouido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. LG Twin Towers 20 Yeouido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2006/48] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20 Yoido-dong Yongdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Yong Cheol 402-803, Jugong APT. Byeoryang-dong Gwacheon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 427-731 / KR | [2013/35] |
Former [2007/25] | 01 /
PARK, Yong Cheol 402-803, Jugong APT., Byeoryang-dong Gwacheon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 427-731 / KR | ||
Former [2006/48] | 01 /
PARK, Yong Cheol 407-306, Jugong APT., Byeoryang-dong Gwachon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 427-731 / KR | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/48] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04808643.3 | 30.12.2004 | [2006/48] | WO2004KR03515 | Priority number, date | US20040554356P | 19.03.2004 Original published format: US 554356 P | KR20040039142 | 31.05.2004 Original published format: KR 2004039142 | [2006/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005091292 | Date: | 29.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1726015 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1726015 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 29.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/32, G11B20/18, G11B20/12, G11B27/30 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B7/007 (KR);
G11B20/12 (EP,KR,US);
G11B20/1217 (EP,US);
G11B20/1252 (EP,US);
G11B20/1883 (EP,US);
G11B27/3027 (EP,US);
G11B27/322 (EP,US);
G11B27/36 (EP,US);
G11B7/0037 (EP,US);
G11B7/00375 (EP,US);
G11B7/00736 (EP,US);
G11B2007/0013 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1221 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1229 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1265 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1277 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1278 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1873 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1896 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/48] | G11B20/12, G11B20/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/48] | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM MIT INFORMATIONEN DER PHYSISCHEN ZUGANGSSTEUERUNG (PAC) DARAUF UND VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERZEUGEN, AUFZEICHNEN UND WIEDERGEBEN DES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUMS | [2006/48] | English: | RECORDING MEDIUM WITH PHYSICAL ACCESS CONTROL (PAC) INFORMATION THEREON AND APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR FORMING, RECORDING, AND REPRODUCING THE RECORDING MEDIUM | [2006/48] | French: | SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT COMPORTANT DES INFORMATIONS DE CONTROLE D'ACCES PHYSIQUE (PAC) ET APPAREIL ET PROCEDES PERMETTANT DE FORMER, D'ENREGISTRER ET DE REPRODUIRE LE SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2006/48] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 14.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.12.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.12.2012 | 12.12.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 11.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP07120363.2 / EP1887578 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/32] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.08.2013 | BE | 28.08.2013 | BG | 28.08.2013 | CY | 28.08.2013 | CZ | 28.08.2013 | DK | 28.08.2013 | EE | 28.08.2013 | ES | 28.08.2013 | FI | 28.08.2013 | IT | 28.08.2013 | LT | 28.08.2013 | MC | 28.08.2013 | PL | 28.08.2013 | RO | 28.08.2013 | SE | 28.08.2013 | SI | 28.08.2013 | SK | 28.08.2013 | TR | 28.08.2013 | GR | 29.11.2013 | IS | 28.12.2013 | IE | 30.12.2013 | LU | 30.12.2013 | PT | 30.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | [2015/35] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
TR | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
IE | 30.12.2013 | ||
LU | 30.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
IE | 30.12.2013 | ||
LU | 30.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
LU | 30.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
LU | 30.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
BE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 28.08.2013 | |
PT | 30.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH06259886 (SONY CORP); | [A]EP1061517 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) | Examination | WO03030173 | US2003210627 | EP1505597 | WO2005086598 | EP1600975 |