EP1699992 - SAFETY DEVICE FOR A FALL RESTRAINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kedge Holding B.V. Stephensonweg 2 4207 HB Gorinchem / NL | [2006/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASTENBROEK, Martin Meentweg 49 NL-1406 KD Bussum / NL | 02 /
VAN DER MARK, Hendrik Johannes Kerkedijk 51 NL-1862 BE Bergen / NL | [2006/37] | Representative(s) | Jilderda, Anne Ayolt LIOC Patents & Trademarks Zwaanstraat 31 L 5651 CA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/50] | Jilderda, Anne Ayolt Octrooibureau LIOC B.V. Postbus 13363 3507 LJ Utrecht / NL | ||
Former [2009/48] | Jilderda, Anne Ayolt Octrooibureau LIOC B.V., Postbus 13363 3507 LJ Utrecht / NL | ||
Former [2006/37] | Jilderda, Anne Ayolt Octrooibureau LIOC B.V., Postbus 13363 3507 LJ Utrecht / NL | Application number, filing date | 04808810.8 | 21.12.2004 | [2006/37] | WO2004NL00894 | Priority number, date | NL20031025127 | 24.12.2003 Original published format: NL 1025127 | NL20041025821 | 26.03.2004 Original published format: NL 1025821 | [2006/37] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005061818 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1699992 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1699992 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A62B35/00, A62B35/04, E04B1/76, E04G21/32, F16B33/00 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
A62B35/0056 (EP,NO,US);
A62B35/04 (EP,NO,US);
A62B35/0068 (EP,NO,US);
E04G21/3261 (EP,NO,US);
E04G21/3276 (EP,US);
E04G21/328 (EP,US);
E04G21/329 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/37] | E04G21/32, A62B1/04, A62B35/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/50] |
Former [2006/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSVORRICHTUNG ZUM FALLSCHUTZ | [2015/36] | English: | SAFETY DEVICE FOR A FALL RESTRAINT | [2006/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE POUR SYSTEME ANTI-CHUTE | [2006/37] |
Former [2006/37] | SICHERHEITSVORRICHTUNG FÜR STURZSICHERUNG | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/37] | 01.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2004 | AT | 09.12.2015 | BG | 09.12.2015 | CY | 09.12.2015 | CZ | 09.12.2015 | DK | 09.12.2015 | EE | 09.12.2015 | ES | 09.12.2015 | FI | 09.12.2015 | IT | 09.12.2015 | LT | 09.12.2015 | MC | 09.12.2015 | PL | 09.12.2015 | RO | 09.12.2015 | SE | 09.12.2015 | SI | 09.12.2015 | SK | 09.12.2015 | TR | 09.12.2015 | IE | 21.12.2015 | LU | 21.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | GR | 10.03.2016 | IS | 09.04.2016 | PT | 11.04.2016 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 21.12.2004 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BG | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
TR | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 21.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 21.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 21.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 21.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]CH271254 (BRUN JUSTIN [CH]) [A] 1,9 * figure . *; | [X]DE20109056U (ZINK RAINER [DE]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [PA]DE10333113 (OPTIGRUEN INTERNAT AG [DE]) [PA] 1 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0063] ** figures 1,2,9,10 *; | [PX] - ZINCO GMBH, "Fallnet : das intelligente System zur Absturzsicherung", (20040621), URL: http://www.zinco.de/aktuelles/presseberichte/pressebericht_details.php?id=8, (20050412), XP002324449 [PX] 1-10 * the whole document * | [PX] - ZINCO GMBH, "Die Anschlagsicherung Fallnet SE", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20040618), URL: http://www.zinco.de/systemtechnik/extensiv/sicherheit/fallnet/se_edelstahl.php, (20050413), XP002324450 [PX] 1-10 * the whole document * | [L] - ZINCO GMBH, "Die Anschlagsicherung Fallnet SE", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20040618), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20041016122922/www.zinco.de/systemtechnik/extensiv/sicherheit/fallnet/se_edelstahl.php, (20050413), XP002324451 |