EP1698044 - SINGLE WINDING BACK EMF SENSING BRUSHLESS DC MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fisher & Paykel Appliances Ltd. 78 Springs Road East Tamaki Auckland / NZ | [2006/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARWOOD, Jonathan David 27 Rathmar Drive Alfristo n, Auckland / NZ | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2006/36] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04808922.1 | 21.12.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004NZ00327 | Priority number, date | NZ20030530370 | 22.12.2003 Original published format: NZ 53037003 | [2006/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005062460 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1698044 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 07.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/00, H02K29/00 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
H02P6/182 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BÜRSTENLOSER EINZELWICKLUNGS-RÜCK-EMF-ERFASSUNGS-MOTOR | [2006/36] | English: | SINGLE WINDING BACK EMF SENSING BRUSHLESS DC MOTOR | [2006/36] | French: | MOTEUR A COURANT CONTINU SANS BALAIS POUVANT DETECTER LA FORCE ELECTROMOTRICE ARRIERE D'UN BOBINAGE SIMPLE | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 02.03.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0670586 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-8,10-13 * abstract *; | [Y]US5345156 (MOREIRA JULIO CESAR [US]) [Y] 2-4,6-8,11-13* figures 3-10 *; | [YA]US2003231875 (MASINO JAMES E [US]) [Y] 1-8,10-13 * paragraphs [0019] , [0020] , [0053] , [0072]; figures 1-8 * * figure 1 * [A] 9,14 | International search | [AP]US6834407 (STEPHENS CHARLES MICHAEL [US]); | [A]US5382889 (PETERS DAVID H [US], et al); | [A]US5672948 (COHEN ADAM J [US], et al); | [A]US6034493 (BOYD JOHN H [US], et al); | [A]US5534763 (WILLIAMS JOHN J A [NZ], et al) |