EP1829205 - POWER AMPLIFIER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) Patent Unit, KI/ECS/B/AP 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLINGBERG, Mats Götaforsvägen 23 S-122 66 Enskede / SE | 02 /
HELLBERG, Richard Klarabergsvägen 14 S-141 45 Huddinge / SE | [2008/01] |
Former [2007/36] | 01 /
KLINGBERG, Mats Götaforsvägen 23 S-122 66 Enskede / SE | ||
02 /
HELLBERG, Richard Forellvägen 14 3tr S-141 47 Huddinge / SE | Representative(s) | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 04809127.6 | 21.12.2004 | [2007/36] | WO2004SE01954 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006068546 | Date: | 29.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1829205 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1829205 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/02 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
H03F1/0288 (EP,US);
H03F3/24 (EP,US);
H03F3/602 (EP,US);
H03F2200/423 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSVERSTÄRKERSYSTEM | [2007/36] | English: | POWER AMPLIFIER SYSTEM | [2007/36] | French: | SYSTEME D'AMPLIFICATEURS DE PUISSANCE | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 07.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.07.2009 | BE | 22.07.2009 | CY | 22.07.2009 | CZ | 22.07.2009 | DK | 22.07.2009 | EE | 22.07.2009 | FI | 22.07.2009 | IT | 22.07.2009 | LT | 22.07.2009 | NL | 22.07.2009 | PL | 22.07.2009 | RO | 22.07.2009 | SE | 22.07.2009 | SI | 22.07.2009 | SK | 22.07.2009 | TR | 22.07.2009 | BG | 22.10.2009 | GR | 23.10.2009 | ES | 02.11.2009 | IS | 22.11.2009 | PT | 22.11.2009 | GB | 21.12.2009 | IE | 21.12.2009 | LU | 21.12.2009 | CH | 31.12.2009 | LI | 31.12.2009 | HU | 23.01.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
GB | 21.12.2009 | ||
IE | 21.12.2009 | ||
LU | 21.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
HU | 23.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
GB | 21.12.2009 | ||
IE | 21.12.2009 | ||
LU | 21.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
GB | 21.12.2009 | ||
IE | 21.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
GB | 21.12.2009 | ||
IE | 21.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
IE | 21.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
IE | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5886575 (LONG JAMES FRANK [US]); | [A]WO0191282 (DSPC TECH LTD [IL], et al); | [A]WO03061115 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [A]WO2004057755 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) |