EP1660874 - IN-SITU X-RAY DIFFRACTION SYSTEM USING SOURCES AND DETECTORS AT FIXED ANGULAR POSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states X-RAY OPTICAL SYSTEMS, INC. 15 Tech Valley Drive East Greenbush New York 12061 / US | [2006/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIBSON, David M. 526 New Salem Road Voorheesville, New York 12188 / US | 02 /
GIBSON, Walter M. 290 Cass Hill Road Voorheesville, New York 12186 / US | 03 /
HUANG, Huapeng 6 Sable Terrace Latham, New York 12110 / US | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Andrae Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Uhlandstrasse 2 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/24] | Andrae Westendorp Uhlandstrasse 2 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/19] | Friese, Martin Andrae Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/22] | Friese, Martin Andrae Flach Haug Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04809532.7 | 04.08.2004 | [2006/22] | WO2004US25112 | Priority number, date | US20030492400P | 04.08.2003 Original published format: US 492400 P | [2006/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005031329 | Date: | 07.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1660874 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1660874 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N23/20, G01N23/207 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
G01N23/207 (EP,US);
G01N23/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/22] | Title | German: | IN-SITU-RÖNTGENDIFFRAKTIONSSYSTEM MIT QUELLEN UND DETEKTOREN IN POSITIONEN MIT FESTEM WINKEL | [2006/22] | English: | IN-SITU X-RAY DIFFRACTION SYSTEM USING SOURCES AND DETECTORS AT FIXED ANGULAR POSITIONS | [2006/22] | French: | SYSTEME DE DIFFRACTION DES RAYONS X IN-SITU UTILISANT DES SOURCES ET DES DETECTEURS DANS DES POSITIONS ANGULAIRES FIXES | [2006/22] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 14.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 20.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.03.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.08.2004 | AT | 07.05.2014 | BE | 07.05.2014 | BG | 07.05.2014 | CY | 07.05.2014 | CZ | 07.05.2014 | DK | 07.05.2014 | EE | 07.05.2014 | ES | 07.05.2014 | FI | 07.05.2014 | IT | 07.05.2014 | MC | 07.05.2014 | PL | 07.05.2014 | RO | 07.05.2014 | SE | 07.05.2014 | SI | 07.05.2014 | SK | 07.05.2014 | TR | 07.05.2014 | IE | 04.08.2014 | LU | 04.08.2014 | GR | 08.08.2014 | CH | 31.08.2014 | LI | 31.08.2014 | PT | 08.09.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 04.08.2004 | |
AT | 07.05.2014 | ||
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
BG | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
IE | 04.08.2014 | ||
LU | 04.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
BG | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
IE | 04.08.2014 | ||
LU | 04.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
IE | 04.08.2014 | ||
LU | 04.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
LU | 04.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
LU | 04.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
LU | 04.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
LU | 04.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
LU | 04.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 07.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6301330 (KURTZ DAVID S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,12,13,15-17 * abstract * * column 9, line 27 - line 31 * * column 10, line 8 - line 11 * * column 10, line 57 - line 67 * * column 5, paragraph 1; figure 5 * [Y] 2,3,14,18,19; | [XY]US2002003859 (KOGAN VLADIMIR [NL]) [X] 1,4-8,12 * paragraph [0021]; figure 3 * [Y] 2,3,14,15; | [XY]US5148458 (RUUD CLAYTON) [X] 1,4-8,12 * column 1, line 11 - line 23 * * column 7, line 64 - column 8, line 15; figure 5 * [Y] 15,18; | [X]US5784432 (KURTZ DAVID S [US]) [X] 1,4-8,12 * abstract * * column 10, line 1 - line 10 * * column 11, line 6 - line 9; figure 1 *; | [YA]US4649556 (RINIK CHRISTINE [US], et al) [Y] 2,3,19 * column 8, line 45 - line 48 * [A] 16,17; | [E]WO2005010512 (X RAY OPTICAL SYS INC [US], et al) [E] 1,2,4-13,15,18-22 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5148458 | US4649556 | US6301330 |