EP1677920 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING ENHANCED THERMAL CONDUCTIVITY OXIDE NUCLEAR FUEL AND THE NUCLEAR FUEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Areva NP Inc. 3315 Old Forest Road P.O.Box 10935 Lynchburg, VA 24506-0935 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | For all designated states Areva NP Inc. P.O.Box 10935 Lynchburg, VA 24506-0935 / US | ||
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states Framatome ANP Inc. 3315 Old Forest Road, P.O. Box 10935 Lynchburg, VA 24506-0935 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCOY, John, Kevin 225 Farley Branch Drive Lynchburg, VA 24502 / US | [2006/28] | Representative(s) | Domenego, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | Domenego, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04809988.1 | 21.10.2004 | [2006/28] | WO2004US34673 | Priority number, date | US20030692646 | 24.10.2003 Original published format: US 692646 | [2006/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005041208 | Date: | 06.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1677920 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1677920 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1677920 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G21C3/62, G21C3/04, G21C3/07, G21C3/12, G21C19/00 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
G21C3/62 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/28] | B05D7/00, G21C3/00, G21C3/04, G21C3/07, G21C3/12, G21C19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON OXIDKERNBRENNSTOFF MIT VERBESSERTER WÄRMELEITFÄHIGKEIT UND KERNBRENNSTOFF | [2006/28] | English: | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING ENHANCED THERMAL CONDUCTIVITY OXIDE NUCLEAR FUEL AND THE NUCLEAR FUEL | [2006/28] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE COMBUSTIBLE NUCLEAIRE A BASE D'OXYDE A CONDUCTIVITE THERMIQUE AMELIOREE ET COMBUSTIBLE NUCLEAIRE | [2006/28] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 31.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2008 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.08.2011 | CY | 10.08.2011 | CZ | 10.08.2011 | DK | 10.08.2011 | EE | 10.08.2011 | HU | 10.08.2011 | IT | 10.08.2011 | NL | 10.08.2011 | PL | 10.08.2011 | RO | 10.08.2011 | SI | 10.08.2011 | SK | 10.08.2011 | TR | 10.08.2011 | IE | 21.10.2011 | LU | 21.10.2011 | CH | 31.10.2011 | LI | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | BG | 10.11.2011 | GR | 11.11.2011 | PT | 12.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
TR | 10.08.2011 | ||
IE | 21.10.2011 | ||
LU | 21.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
IE | 21.10.2011 | ||
LU | 21.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
IE | 21.10.2011 | ||
LU | 21.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
IE | 21.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | NL | 10.08.2011 | |
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | NL | 10.08.2011 | |
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | NL | 10.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3211626 (NERENSTONE MARC A, et al) [X] 1,3,4,7-9,11,12 * column 5, line 68 - column 13, line 11 * [A] 2,5,6,10,13-16; | [A]US3907948 (GYARMATI ERNO, et al) [A] 1-16* column 2, line 30 - column 6, line 17 *; | [X]US4110159 (LEE HARVEY ROBERT) [X] 1,3-6,9,12 * column 1, line 18 - column 4, line 38 *; | [A]US5429775 (HIRAI MUTSUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * figure 1; claims 1,5 * | International search | [A]US3035325 (NICHOLSON KENNETH C, et al) |