EP1689457 - INTRAVASCULAR DEVICES AND FIBROSIS-INDUCING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2011 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANGIOTECH INTERNATIONAL AG Bundesplatz 1 6304 Zug / CH | [2006/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUNTER, William, L. 1618 Station Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6A 1B6 / CA | 02 /
GRAVETT, David, M. 616 West 21st Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V5Z 1Y8 / CA | 03 /
TOLEIKIS, Philip, M. 8011 Laburnum Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6P 5N8 / CA | 04 /
MAITI, Arpita 211 - 2920 Ash Street Vancouver, British Columbia V5Z 4A6 / CA | 05 /
SIGNORE, Pierre, E. 207 - 2155 West 7th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V6K 1X9 / CA | 06 /
LIGGINS, Richard, T. 407 Lakeview Street Coquitlam, British Columbia V3K 5K7 / CA | 07 /
GUAN, Dechi 8363 Shaughnessy Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6P 3Y1 / CA | [2006/33] | Representative(s) | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/33] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04811096.9 | 10.11.2004 | [2006/33] | WO2004US38247 | Priority number, date | US20030518785P | 10.11.2003 Original published format: US 518785 P | US20030523908P | 20.11.2003 Original published format: US 523908 P | US20030524023P | 20.11.2003 Original published format: US 524023 P | US20040578471P | 09.06.2004 Original published format: US 578471 P | US20040582833P | 24.06.2004 Original published format: US 582833 P | US20040586861P | 09.07.2004 Original published format: US 586861 P | [2006/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005046747 | Date: | 26.05.2005 | [2005/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1689457 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/00, A61L27/54, A61L31/00, A61L31/16 | [2006/33] | CPC: |
A61B17/12172 (EP,US);
A61B17/11 (EP,US);
A61B17/12022 (EP,US);
A61B17/12045 (EP,US);
A61B17/12136 (EP,US);
A61B17/1215 (EP,US);
A61B17/12177 (EP,US);
A61B17/12186 (EP,US);
A61B17/1219 (EP,US);
A61F2/86 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61B17/00491 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTRAVASKULÄRE VORRICHTUNGEN UND FIBROSE-INDUZIERENDE MITTEL | [2006/33] | English: | INTRAVASCULAR DEVICES AND FIBROSIS-INDUCING AGENTS | [2006/33] | French: | DISPOSITIFS INTRAVASCULAIRES ET AGENTS INDUCTEURS DE FIBROSE | [2006/33] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/33] | 28.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/21] | 26.04.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.06.2011 | 28.06.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.12.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.10.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 26.10.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |