EP1687163 - LOWERING OF REFRIGERANT EMISSIONS BY CYCLING OF A VARIABLE DISPLACEMENT COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. M/C 480-414-420, P.O. Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007-5052 / US | [2006/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHMED, Umair, S. 290 Riverbend Drive 3A Charlottesville, VA 22911 / US | 02 /
WOLFE, Edward, I., IV. 51 Schoelles Road Amherst, NY 14228 / US | 03 /
KADLE, Prasad, S. 25 Davinci Court Williamsville, NY 14221 / US | 04 /
KUMPF, William, J. 295 Continental Drive Lockport, NY 14094 / US | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi European Headquarters 64 avenue de la Pleine de France Paris Nord II B.P. 65059, Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/32] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi European Headquarters, B.P. 65059 Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy / FR | Application number, filing date | 04811312.0 | 17.11.2004 | [2006/32] | WO2004US38554 | Priority number, date | US20030520743P | 17.11.2003 Original published format: US 520743 P | US20040989867 | 16.11.2004 Original published format: US 989867 | [2006/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005049347 | Date: | 02.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1687163 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1687163 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/32, F25B31/00 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
B60H1/3225 (EP,US);
F25B49/022 (EP,US);
B60H2001/3238 (EP,US);
B60H2001/3272 (EP,US);
F25B2327/001 (EP,US);
F25B2400/076 (EP,US);
F25B2500/221 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/32] | B60H1/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERRINGERUNG VON KÄLTEMITTELEMISSIONEN DURCH ZYKLISCHEN BETRIEB EINES KOMPRESSORS MIT VARIABLER VERDRÄNGUNG | [2006/32] | English: | LOWERING OF REFRIGERANT EMISSIONS BY CYCLING OF A VARIABLE DISPLACEMENT COMPRESSOR | [2006/32] | French: | ABAISSEMENT DES EMISSIONS DE LIQUIDE REFRIGERANT PAR ETABLISSEMENT DE CYCLES DANS UN COMPRESSEUR A CYLINDREE VARIABLE | [2006/32] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 23.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.05.2010 | BE | 05.05.2010 | CY | 05.05.2010 | CZ | 05.05.2010 | DK | 05.05.2010 | EE | 05.05.2010 | FI | 05.05.2010 | IT | 05.05.2010 | NL | 05.05.2010 | PL | 05.05.2010 | RO | 05.05.2010 | SE | 05.05.2010 | SI | 05.05.2010 | SK | 05.05.2010 | TR | 05.05.2010 | BG | 05.08.2010 | GR | 06.08.2010 | ES | 16.08.2010 | IS | 05.09.2010 | PT | 06.09.2010 | HU | 06.11.2010 | IE | 17.11.2010 | LU | 17.11.2010 | CH | 30.11.2010 | LI | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
TR | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
HU | 06.11.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
LU | 17.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
HU | 06.11.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
LU | 17.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
HU | 06.11.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | NL | 05.05.2010 | |
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 05.05.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3738118 (JACOBS J) [A] 1-17 * column 4, line 18 - column 5, line 2; claim - *; | [A]US6145325 (HANSELMANN KLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 42; claim - *; | [A]EP1077146 (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0010] - [0013]; figure 2; claim - *; | [A]US2001032471 (TAGUCHI YUKIHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-17* paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0024] - [0029]; claim - * | International search | [A]US3738118 (JACOBS J); | [A]US4480443 (NISHI YASUYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US5323619 (KIM TAE DUK [KR]); | [A]US5673568 (ISSHIKI MASAO [JP]); | [A]US6145325 (HANSELMANN KLAUS [DE], et al); | [AP]US6748756 (KADLE PRASAD SHRIPAD [US], et al) | by applicant | US3738118 | US6247900 |