EP1794686 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING A CLIP FOR VIEWING AT A REMOTE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yahoo! Inc. Legal Department D-274 701 First Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states Yahoo! Inc. Legal Department, D-274, 701 First Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUI, Yingqing, Lawrence 1047 South Blaney Avenue San Jose, CA 95129 / US | 02 /
ZHOU, Min 4267 Los Palos Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 03 /
JIANG, Zhaowei, Charlie 779 Encina Grande Drive Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2007/24] | Representative(s) | Palmer, Jonathan R., et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | Palmer, Jonathan R., et al Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens, 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 04811415.1 | 17.11.2004 | [2007/24] | WO2004US38699 | Priority number, date | US20040951982 | 28.09.2004 Original published format: US 951982 | [2007/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006036166 | Date: | 06.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1794686 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/24, H04L29/08 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
H04L63/102 (EP,US);
G06F16/9577 (EP,US);
G06F17/00 (KR);
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04L67/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/24] | G06F17/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES CLIPS ZUM AUFRUFEN AUF EINER ENTFERNTEN VORRICHTUNG | [2007/24] | English: | METHOD FOR PROVIDING A CLIP FOR VIEWING AT A REMOTE DEVICE | [2007/24] | French: | PROCEDE DE FOURNITURE D'UN CLIP A VISUALISER SUR UN DISPOSITIF DISTANT | [2007/24] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 06.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0073902 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 7, line 20 - line l * * page 8, lines 16-17 * * page 9, line 5 - page 10, line 10 * * page 14, line 19 - page 15, line 13 *; | [X]EP1259042 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract *; | [XY]US2003069004 (HAMYNEN KIMMO [FI], et al) [X] 1-3,5-15 * the whole document * [Y] 4; | [Y]US2003125023 (FISHLER EYAL [IL]) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0029] *; | [X]US2003182388 (ALEXANDER GEOFFREY D [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2003236917 (GIBBS MATTHEW E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] ** paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] * | International search | [X]US2003069004 (HAMYNEN KIMMO [FI], et al); | [Y]US2003125023 (FISHLER EYAL [IL]) |