EP1685572 - ILLUMINATED POINTER ENABLING INDEPENDENT POINTING ON TWO SCALES SIMULTANEOUSLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive Systems US, Inc. One Continental Drive Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | [2008/48] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states Siemens VDO Automotive Corporation 2400 Executive Hills Drive Auburn Hills Michigan 48326-2980 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIRMAN, Vyacheslav 3625 Thornwood Drive US-Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | 02 /
ECKARDT, Werner 1400 Ross Lane Rochester, MI 48306 / US | 03 /
TANGUY, Christian 2508 Woodchase Ct. Sterling Heights, MI 48310 / US | [2006/42] |
Former [2006/31] | 01 /
BIRMAN, Vyacheslav 3140 Fallen Oaks Ct. Rochester Hills, MI 48309 / US | ||
02 /
ECKARDT, Werner 1400 Ross Lane Rochester, MI 48306 / US | |||
03 /
TANGUY, Christian 2508 Woodchase Ct. Sterling Heights, MI 48310 / US | Representative(s) | Fischer, Michael, et al Continental Automotive GmbH Patentabteilung Lilienthalstrasse 15 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | Fischer, Michael, et al Continental Automotive GmbH Patentabteilung Lilienthalstrasse 15 85579 Neubiberg / DE | ||
Former [2006/31] | Fischer, Michael Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04811470.6 | 18.11.2004 | [2006/31] | WO2004US38758 | Priority number, date | US20030523329P | 21.11.2003 Original published format: US 523329 P | [2006/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005052948 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1685572 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1685572 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G12B11/04, G01D13/28, G01D11/28, G01P1/08 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
G01D13/26 (EP,US);
G01P1/07 (EP,US);
G01P1/08 (EP,US);
G12B11/04 (EP,US);
Y10S116/06 (EP,US);
Y10S116/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/09] |
Former [2006/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EIN UNABHÄNGIGES GLEICHZEITIGES ZEIGEN AUF ZWEI MASSSTÄBE ERMÖGLICHENDER BELEUCHTETER ZEIGER | [2006/31] | English: | ILLUMINATED POINTER ENABLING INDEPENDENT POINTING ON TWO SCALES SIMULTANEOUSLY | [2006/31] | French: | POINTEUR ILLUMINE PERMETTANT LE POINTAGE INDEPENDANT SIMULTANEMENT SUR DEUX ECHELLES | [2006/31] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 17.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.11.2010 | [2011/47] | Cited in | International search | [A]US2810362 (OTTAR LINDHEIM) [A] 1,10 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0411799 (COMBINED OPTICAL IND LTD [GB]) [A] 1,10 * abstract *; | [A]US4054105 (FEGAN FRANCIS) [A] 1,10 * figure 1 * |