EP1690075 - FIELD AND STORAGE CHEMICAL TEST METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIN/NIP, Inc. 2307 East Commercial Street Meridian, ID 83642-5973 / US | [2006/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSYTHE, John, M. 4277 Balivi Lane Nampa, ID 83687 / US | 02 /
DE WEERD, Jan, W. 2621 North Miranda Avenue Meridian, ID 83642 / US | [2006/33] | Representative(s) | Williams, Paul Edwin, et al Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London W1W 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | Williams, Paul Edwin, et al Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street London W1U 6FQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04811532.3 | 19.11.2004 | [2006/33] | WO2004US38829 | Priority number, date | US20030719929 | 21.11.2003 Original published format: US 719929 | [2006/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005052549 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1690075 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1690075 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/02, B01L99/00 | [2010/38] | CPC: |
G01N1/34 (EP,US);
B01L1/52 (EP,US);
B01L2300/1805 (EP,US);
G01N1/38 (EP,US);
G01N2001/4061 (EP,US);
Y10T436/255 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/33] | G01N1/02, B01L11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHEMISCHES FELD- UND SPEICHERTESTVERFAHREN | [2006/33] | English: | FIELD AND STORAGE CHEMICAL TEST METHOD | [2006/33] | French: | PROCEDE SERVANT A RECHERCHER DES RESIDUS CHIMIQUES DANS DES SPECIMENS | [2006/33] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/33] | 21.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10172206.4 / EP2270464 | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.09.2010 | CY | 22.09.2010 | CZ | 22.09.2010 | DK | 22.09.2010 | EE | 22.09.2010 | FI | 22.09.2010 | IT | 22.09.2010 | RO | 22.09.2010 | SE | 22.09.2010 | SI | 22.09.2010 | SK | 22.09.2010 | TR | 22.09.2010 | IE | 19.11.2010 | LU | 19.11.2010 | CH | 30.11.2010 | LI | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | BG | 22.12.2010 | GR | 23.12.2010 | ES | 02.01.2011 | IS | 22.01.2011 | PT | 24.01.2011 | HU | 23.03.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BG | 22.09.2010 | ||
CY | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
TR | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 19.11.2010 | ||
LU | 19.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
HU | 23.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BG | 22.09.2010 | ||
CY | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 19.11.2010 | ||
LU | 19.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
HU | 23.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BG | 22.09.2010 | ||
CY | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 19.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
HU | 23.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BG | 22.09.2010 | ||
CY | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 19.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
CY | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 19.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 19.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 22.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4492759 (GORMAN ESTHER M [US], et al) [AD] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [AD]US4992379 (HANBY JOHN D [US]) [AD] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0832689 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 1-21 * figures 1-5 *; | [X] - EVERARD J. EDWARDS AND ANDREW H. COBB, "Improved High-Performance Liquid Chromatographic Method for the Analysis of Potato (Solanum tuberosum) Glycoalkaloids", J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (1996), vol. 44, pages 2705 - 2709, XP002323658 [X] 1-21 * paragraphs Plant Material and TGA Extraction * * paragraph Separation and Analysis * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf9507405 | [A] - ESCUDEROS-MORENAS M L ET AL, "Direct determination of monolinuron, linuron and chlorbromuron residues in potato samples by gas chromatography with nitrogen-phosphorus detection", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, NL, (20030905), vol. 1011, no. 1-2, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 143 - 153, XP004450627 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(03)01139-7 | by applicant | EP0832689 | - EVERARD J. EDWARDS; ANDREW H. COBS, "Improved High-Performance Liquid Chromatographic Method for the Analysis of Potato (Solanum tuberosum) Glycoalkaloids", J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (1996), vol. 44, pages 2705 - 2709 |