EP1690238 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PREPARING INDIVIDUALIZED DOSAGE FORMS OF MEDICAMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states D'SILVA, Joe 753 Shearer Street North Wales, PA 19454 / US | [2006/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/33] | Representative(s) | Ackermann, Joachim, et al Mannheimer Straße 97 60327 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2014/45] |
Former [2006/33] | Ackermann, Joachim Postfach 11 13 26 60048 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 04811568.7 | 18.11.2004 | [2006/33] | WO2004US38868 | Priority number, date | US20030525276P | 26.11.2003 Original published format: US 525276 P | [2006/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005053608 | Date: | 16.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1690238 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G07F11/00, A61J3/07, G07F9/02 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
A61J3/074 (EP,US);
G07F17/0092 (EP,US);
G07F9/02 (EP,US);
A61J2200/74 (EP,US);
A61K9/0056 (EP,US);
A61K9/0095 (EP,US);
A61K9/4808 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/33] | G07F11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM PREPARIEREN INDIVIDUALISIERTER DOSIERUNGSFORMEN VON MEDIKAMENTEN | [2006/33] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PREPARING INDIVIDUALIZED DOSAGE FORMS OF MEDICAMENTS | [2006/33] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE FORMES POSOLOGIQUES PERSONNALISEES DE MEDICAMENTS | [2006/33] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/33] | 21.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.09.2016 | 14.09.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/09] | 09.10.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4712511 (ZAMZOW DONALD D [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9502387 (HAMM MANFRED R [DE]) [X] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]US5853244 (HOFF CHARLES HENRY [US], et al) [A] 1-25* the whole document *; | [X]US6286567 (RUNFT WERNER [DE]) [X] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03056493 (LAEHTEENMAEKI PERTTI [FI]) [X] 1-25 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5176285 (SHAW THOMAS J [US]); | [A]US6497342 (ZHANG BIN [US], et al) |