EP1692474 - TOOTH LOCATING WITHIN DENTAL IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carestream Health, Inc. 150 Verona Street, MC=01135 Rochester, New York 14608 / US | [2008/01] |
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Jiebo 5 Tippet Way Pittsford, New York 14534 / US | 02 /
BOLIN, Mark Robert 57 Broadmoor Trail Fairport, New York 14450 / US | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/34] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas Kodak Industrie Département Brevets et Licences CRT 60/2 Zone Industrielle F-71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04811913.5 | 22.11.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004US39276 | Priority number, date | US20030731231 | 09.12.2003 Original published format: US 731231 | [2006/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005062007 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1692474 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1692474 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/50 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
G01J3/50 (EP,US);
G01J3/508 (EP,US);
G06T7/12 (EP,US);
G06T7/149 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20124 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30036 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR [2007/12] |
Former [2006/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FINDEN VON ZÄHNEN IN ZAHNMEDIZINISCHEN BILDERN | [2006/34] | English: | TOOTH LOCATING WITHIN DENTAL IMAGES | [2006/34] | French: | LOCALISATION DE DENTS AU SEIN D'IMAGES DENTAIRES | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 20.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6328567 (MORRIS ALAN C [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * column 3, lines 44-48 * * column 5, lines 50-55 * * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 15 * * column 7, line 40 - column 8, line 4 * * column 8, lines 40-50 * * column 8, line 65 - column 9, line 7 ** column 9, lines 15-24 *; | [A]WO03083765 (COLOR SAVVY SYSTEMS LTD [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 1, lines 1-24 * * page 6, line 12 - page 7, line 17 * * page 8, line 18 - page 9, line 23 * * page 12, lines 2-23 *; | [A] - VAN GINNEKEN B ET AL, "A non-linear gray-level appearance model improves active shape model segmentation", MATHEMATICAL METHODS IN BIOMEDICAL IMAGE ANALYSIS, 2001. MMBIA 2001. IEEE WORKSHOP ON KAUAI, HI, USA 9-10 DEC. 2001, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (20011209), ISBN 0-7695-1336-0, pages 205 - 212, XP010584877 [A] 3-16 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MMBIA.2001.991735 |