EP1684883 - LIQUID ACTIVATED TOYS AND OPERATING SYSTEM FOR USE WITH SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATTEL, INC. 333 Continental Boulevard El Segundo, CA 90245 / US | [2006/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRAGESER, Mark 1788 South Garth Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90035 / US | 02 /
POHLMAN, Kip 7412 Stewart Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90045 / US | 03 /
STONER, DON, Wayne 6028 Harvey Way Lakewood, CA 90713 / US | 04 /
GINKEL, Ernst, E. 2649 Roadrunner Drive La Verne, CA 91750 / US | 05 /
MARTIN, Raymond, J. 14343 Addison Street, Apt. 226 Sherman Oaks, CA 91423 / US | [2006/39] |
Former [2006/31] | 01 /
TRAGESER, Mark 1788 South Garth Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90035 / US | ||
02 /
POHLMAN, Kip 7412 Stewart Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90045 / US | |||
03 /
STONER, DON, Wayne 6028 Harvey Way Lakewood, CA 90713 / US | |||
04 /
GINKEL, Ernst, E. 2649 Roadrunner Drive La Verne, CA 91750 / US | |||
05 /
MARTIN, Raymond, J. 3621 Emerald Street, Apt. 31 Torrance, CA 90503 / US | Representative(s) | Müller, Gerald Christian, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Müller, Gerald Christian, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/31] | Müller, Gerald Christian, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 D-81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04811943.2 | 22.11.2004 | [2006/31] | WO2004US39313 | Priority number, date | US20030524319P | 21.11.2003 Original published format: US 524319 P | US20030530549P | 17.12.2003 Original published format: US 530549 P | US20040993794 | 19.11.2004 Original published format: US 993794 | [2006/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005051506 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1684883 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1684883 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.04.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A63H33/04 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
A63H17/26 (EP);
A63H17/10 (EP);
A63H29/00 (EP);
A63H29/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/31] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSAKTIVIERTE SPIELZEUGE UND BETRIEBSSYSTEM ZUM EINSATZ DAMIT | [2006/31] | English: | LIQUID ACTIVATED TOYS AND OPERATING SYSTEM FOR USE WITH SAME | [2006/31] | French: | JOUETS À ACTIVATION LIQUIDE ET SYSTÈME D'EXPLOITATION UTILISÉ AVEC CES JOUETS | [2012/51] |
Former [2006/31] | JOUETS A ACTIVATION LIQUIDE ET SYSTEME D'EXPLOITATION UTILISE AVEC CES JOUETS | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 31.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.11.2004 | AT | 08.05.2013 | BE | 08.05.2013 | CY | 08.05.2013 | CZ | 08.05.2013 | DK | 08.05.2013 | EE | 08.05.2013 | FI | 08.05.2013 | IT | 08.05.2013 | MC | 08.05.2013 | NL | 08.05.2013 | PL | 08.05.2013 | RO | 08.05.2013 | SE | 08.05.2013 | SI | 08.05.2013 | SK | 08.05.2013 | TR | 08.05.2013 | BG | 08.08.2013 | GR | 09.08.2013 | ES | 19.08.2013 | IS | 08.09.2013 | PT | 09.09.2013 | IE | 22.11.2013 | LU | 22.11.2013 | CH | 30.11.2013 | LI | 30.11.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
TR | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
IE | 22.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
IE | 22.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | PT | 09.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4347683 (MAXIM JOHN) [X] 1-28 * column 5, line 55 - column 5, line 43 * * column 9, line 51 - line 53 * * claims 1-19 * * figures 1-21 *; | [X]JP2000089654 (BANDAI CO) [X] 1,4-11,18,19 * abstract ** figures 1-4 *; | [X]WO0174463 (BANDAI CO [JP]) [X] 1,4-11,18,19 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * | International search | [X]US4547169 ; | [Y]JP2000262766 |