EP1769634 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR HARDWARE REGISTRATION IN A NETWORK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Time Warner Cable Enterprises LLC 60 Columbus Circle New York, NY 10023 / US | [2015/23] |
Former [2014/33] | For all designated states Time Warner Cable Inc. 60 Columbus Circle New York, New York 10023 / US | ||
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Time Warner Cable, Inc. 290 Harbour Drive Stamford, CT 06902 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LADD, Patrick 1718 Medinah Road San Marcos, CA 92069 / US | 02 /
SAROSI, George, W. 12018 Delmahoy Drive Charlotte, NC 28277 / US | [2007/14] | Representative(s) | Dolleymores 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | [2019/38] |
Former [2007/14] | Fitchett, Stuart Paul Saunders & Dolleymore European Patent Attorneys 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04812351.7 | 23.11.2004 | [2007/14] | WO2004US39815 | Priority number, date | US20030723959 | 24.11.2003 Original published format: US 723959 | [2007/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005052766 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1769634 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1769634 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04L12/26, G06F9/54, H04N21/426, H04N21/81, H04L29/06, H04L29/08 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
H04L12/2805 (EP,US);
H04L43/04 (US);
H04L12/2814 (EP,US);
H04L12/282 (EP,US);
H04L67/10 (US);
H04N21/42684 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/14] | H04N7/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/38] |
Former [2007/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HARDWAREREGISTRIERUNG IN EINER NETZWERKEINRICHTUNG | [2019/18] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR HARDWARE REGISTRATION IN A NETWORK DEVICE | [2007/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT L'ENREGISTREMENT DE MATÉRIEL DANS UN DISPOSITIF RÉSEAU | [2019/18] |
Former [2007/14] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR HARDWAREREGISTRATION IN EINER NETZWERKEINRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2007/14] | PROCEDES ET DISPOSITIFS PERMETTANT L'ENREGISTREMENT DE MATERIEL DANS UN DISPOSITIF RESEAU | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 19.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2006 | Examination requested [2007/14] | 03.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2018 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 17.05.2018 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 13.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.11.2004 | AT | 18.09.2019 | CY | 18.09.2019 | CZ | 18.09.2019 | DK | 18.09.2019 | EE | 18.09.2019 | ES | 18.09.2019 | FI | 18.09.2019 | IT | 18.09.2019 | MC | 18.09.2019 | NL | 18.09.2019 | PL | 18.09.2019 | RO | 18.09.2019 | SE | 18.09.2019 | SI | 18.09.2019 | SK | 18.09.2019 | TR | 18.09.2019 | IE | 23.11.2019 | LU | 23.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | BG | 18.12.2019 | GR | 19.12.2019 | IS | 19.01.2020 | PT | 20.01.2020 | [2022/26] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 23.11.2004 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
IE | 23.11.2019 | ||
LU | 23.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
IE | 23.11.2019 | ||
LU | 23.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
IE | 23.11.2019 | ||
LU | 23.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
IE | 23.11.2019 | ||
LU | 23.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
LU | 23.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
LU | 23.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
LU | 23.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | EE | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 18.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6192403 (JONG KENNETH [US], et al) [Y] 19,20,22-24,30-33 * column 2, line 33 - line 40 * * column 3, line 54 - line 60 * * column 6, line 31 - line 45 *; | [X]US2002044569 (KWOK TIMOTHY C [US], et al) [X] 34* paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] *; | [XAY]US2003110331 (KAWANO SEIICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,10,11 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0019] * [A] 34 [Y] 19,20,22-24,30-33 | International search | [A]US5664046 (ABECASSIS MAX [US]); | [A]US6317881 (SHAH-NAZAROFF ANTHONY A [US], et al); | [A]US6469742 (TROVATO KAREN I [US], et al) | Examination | EP1046259 | US6546419 | by applicant | US6192403 | US2003110331 |