EP1694224 - FLEXIBLE SPINAL FIXATION ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Spine, Inc. 325 Paramount Drive Raynham, MA 02767 / US | [2006/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SICVOL, Christopher, W. 529 Columbus Avenue 3 Boston, MA 02118 / US | 02 /
MAHONEY, Michael 4 Gae Street Middletown, RI 02842 / US | 03 /
HAWKINS, J., Riley 40 Cook Road Cumberland, RI 02864 / US | 04 /
BRENNAN, James 3405 Tennyson Drive Florence, SC 29501 / US | 05 /
LAURYSSEN, Carl 18860 Pacific Coast Highway Malibu, CA 90265 / US | 06 /
RUBERTE, Ramon, A. 3060 Whisperwood Drive, Apt. 409 Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | [2006/35] | Representative(s) | Orr, Robert, et al Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Orr, Robert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2006/35] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04812364.0 | 29.11.2004 | [2006/35] | WO2004US39829 | Priority number, date | US20030737734 | 16.12.2003 Original published format: US 737734 | [2006/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005060526 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1694224 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/56 | [2006/35] | CPC: |
A61B17/7085 (EP,US);
A61B17/7004 (EP,US);
A61B17/7013 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLEXIBLE WIRBELSÄULENFIXATIONSELEMENTE | [2006/35] | English: | FLEXIBLE SPINAL FIXATION ELEMENTS | [2006/35] | French: | ELEMENTS DE FIXATION VERTEBRALE SOUPLES | [2006/35] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2006 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 09.10.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002040222 (HASHIMOTO TOMOYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US6607530 (CARL ALLEN [US], et al); | [A]US2003220643 (FERREE BRET A [US]); | [YP]US6786909 (DRANSFELD CLEMENS [CH], et al); | [XP]US2004236327 (PAUL DAVID C [US], et al); | [AE]US2004267277 (ZANNIS ANTHONY D [US], et al); | [XE]US2005065516 (JAHNG TAE-AHN [KR]) |