EP1754278 - MULTI-BAND ANTENNA SYSTEMS INCLUDING A PLURALITY OF SEPARATE LOW-BAND FREQUENCY ANTENNAS, WIRELESS TERMINALS AND RADIOTELEPHONES INCORPORATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB Nya Vattentornet 221 83 Lund / SE | [2007/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANCE, Scott L. 132 Woodland Drive Cary, NC 27513 / US | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | Chamberlain, Alan James, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Chamberlain, Alan James, et al Haseltine Lake Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2007/08] | Vigars, Christopher Ian HASELTINE LAKE Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04812507.4 | 30.11.2004 | [2007/08] | WO2004US40006 | Priority number, date | US20040848026 | 18.05.2004 Original published format: US 848026 | [2007/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005117536 | Date: | 15.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1754278 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H01Q21/28 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
H01Q21/28 (EP,US);
H01Q1/243 (EP,US);
H01Q21/29 (EP,US);
H01Q21/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/08] | H01Q1/38, H01Q1/24, H01Q21/12, H01Q3/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/34] |
Former [2007/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIBANDANTENNENSYSTEME EINSCHLIEssLICH EINER VIELZAHL EINZELNER NIEDERFREQUENZANTENNEN, DRAHTLOSER TERMINALS UND FUNKSPRECHGERÄTE IN DIE SELBIGE VERBAUT SIND | [2007/08] | English: | MULTI-BAND ANTENNA SYSTEMS INCLUDING A PLURALITY OF SEPARATE LOW-BAND FREQUENCY ANTENNAS, WIRELESS TERMINALS AND RADIOTELEPHONES INCORPORATING THE SAME | [2007/08] | French: | SYSTEMES D'ANTENNES MULTIBANDES COMPORTANT UNE PLURALITE D'ANTENNES BANDE BASSE SEPAREES, TERMINAUX SANS FIL ET RADIOTELEPHONES FAISANT INTERVENIR CES SYSTEMES | [2007/08] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/40] | 08.05.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/40] | 15.05.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2293277 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1,17 * page 7, line 10 - page 10, line 15; figures 1-5 *; | [X]EP1329980 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-28 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043]; figure 10 *; | [A]US6734825 (GUO YONGXIN [SG], et al) [A] 4,20* column 2, lines 10-25; figures 1,2 * | International search | [Y]US6734825 (GUO YONGXIN [SG], et al); | [X]US6806835 (IWAI HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [X]US6295030 (KOZAKAI OSAMU [JP], et al) |