EP1692558 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING OPTICAL AND DIGITAL SYSTEM DESIGNS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CDM Optics, Inc. Suite 130, 4001 Discovery Drive Boulder, CO 80303 / US | [2006/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOWSKI, Edward, Raymond, Jr. 307 East Cleveland Street Lafayette, CO 80026 / US | 02 /
JOHNSON, Gregory E. 1180 Monroe Drive, Apartment B Boulder, CO 80303 / US | 03 /
KUBELA, Kenneth, Scott 1190 Georgetown Road Boulder, CO 80305 / US | 04 /
MACON, Kenneth, Ashley 4508 Bella Vista Drive Longmont, CO 80503 / US | 05 /
RAUKER, Goran, M. 4608 Portofino Drive Longmont, CO 80503 / US | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 33 04 29 80064 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/38] | Kudlek & Grunert Patentanwälte Postfach 33 04 29 80064 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/34] | Kudlek, Franz Thomas Hössle Kudlek & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 04812670.0 | 01.12.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004US40218 | Priority number, date | US20030526216P | 01.12.2003 Original published format: US 526216 P | [2006/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005054927 | Date: | 16.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1692558 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/00 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
G02B27/0025 (EP,US);
G02B27/0012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM OPTIMIEREN VON OPTISCHEN UND DIGITALEN SYSTEMENTWÜRFEN | [2006/34] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING OPTICAL AND DIGITAL SYSTEM DESIGNS | [2006/34] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR OPTIMISER DES MODELES DE SYSTEMES OPTIQUES ET NUMERIQUES | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 08.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/42] | 14.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5748371 (CATHEY JR WADE THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-69 * abstract *; | [A]WO02052331 (CDM OPTICS INC [US]) [A] 1-69 * abstract *; | [A]US2002118457 (DOWSKI EDWARD RAYMOND [US]) [A] 1-69 * abstract *; | [A]WO03073153 (CDM OPTICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-69 * abstract *; | [A]US2003169944 (DOWSKI EDWARD RAYMOND [US], et al) [A] 1-69 * abstract *; | [X] - DOWSKI E R ET AL, "WAVEFRONT CODING: A MODERN METHOD OF ACHIEVING HIGH PERFORMANCE AND/OR LOW COST IMAGING SYSTEMS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (199907), vol. 3779, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 137 - 145, XP008038139 [X] 1-69 * page 142, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 143 * * figure 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.368203 | [A] - DOWSKI E R ET AL, "WAVEFRONT CODING FOR DETECTION AND ESTIMATION WITH A SINGLE-LENS INCOHERENT OPTICAL SYSTEM", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP). DETROIT, MAY 9 - 12, 1995. IMAGE AND MULTI-DIMENSIONAL SIGNAL PROCESSING/ SIGNAL PROCESSING APPLICATIONS DEVELOPMENT, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19950509), VOL. 4 CONF. 20, ISBN 0-7803-2432-3, pages 2451 - 2454, XP000535440 [A] 1-69 * abstract * | [A] - ROB VAN DEN BERG, "Wavefront coding keeps a focus on applications", OPTO & LASER EUROPE, (200310), URL: http://optics.org/articles/ole/8/10/5, (20050623), XP002333249 [A] 1-69 * the whole document * | [A] - SCHUHMANN R ET AL, "ENHANCEMENTS IN THE OPTIMISATION PROCESS IN LENS DESIGN (I)", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, CURRENT DEVELOPMENTS IN LENS DESIGN AND OPTICAL ENGINEERING II, BELLINGHAM, US, (200112), vol. 4441, pages 30 - 36, XP002321543 [A] 1-69 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.449567 | [A] - ADAMS G ET AL, "ENHANCEMENTS IN THE OPTIMISATION PROCESS IN LENS DESIGN (II)", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, CURRENT DEVELOPMENTS IN LENS DESIGN AND OPTICAL ENGINEERING II, BELLINGHAM, US, (200112), vol. 4441, pages 37 - 42, XP002321544 [A] 1-69 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.449565 | [A] - ALTER-GARTENBERG R, "INFORMATION METRIC AS A DESIGN TOOL FOR OPTOELECTRONIC IMAGING SYSTEMS", APPLIED OPTICS., OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, US, (20000410), vol. 39, no. 11, pages 1743 - 1760, XP002321545 [A] 1-69 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.39.001743 |