Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7434847 | Global Dossier | 14.10.2008 | B2 | US2005121908 | 09.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US309304 | 03.12.2004 | US52685203 | 04.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4736057B | Global Dossier | 27.07.2011 | B2 | JP2007513306 | 24.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US52685203 | 04.12.2003 | WO2004US40516 | 03.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004297597 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US52685203 | 04.12.2003 | WO2004US40516 | 03.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1692426 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2011 | B1 | EP1692426 | 23.08.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US52685203 | 04.12.2003 | WO2004US40516 | 03.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004032376D1 | 01.06.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US52685203 | 04.12.2003 | WO2004US40516 | 03.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005057066 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2005 | A3 | WO2005057066 | 23.06.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US52685203 | 04.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100414160C | 27.08.2008 | C | CN1890501 | 03.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US52685203 | 04.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2361839T | 22.06.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US52685203 | 04.12.2003 |