EP1692426 - QUICK CONNECT TUBE COUPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [2006/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENSEL, David, S. 6602 North Street Whitehouse, OH 43571 / US | 02 /
HAUBERT, Steven, D. 7947 Windmill Ct. Sylvania, OH 43560 / US | 03 /
OLSON, Darwin, C. 28985 White Road Perrysburg, OH 43551 / US | 04 /
VAN RIPER, Phillip, C. 7751 Ginger Gold Dr. Holland, OH 43528 / US | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen a. N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Patentanwälte Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04812937.3 | 03.12.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004US40516 | Priority number, date | US20030526852P | 04.12.2003 Original published format: US 526852 P | [2006/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005057066 | Date: | 23.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1692426 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1692426 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/092 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
F16L37/0925 (EP,US);
F16L37/0926 (EP,US);
F16L37/0927 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2007/11] |
Former [2006/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNELLVERBINDUNGSROHRKUPPLUNG | [2006/34] | English: | QUICK CONNECT TUBE COUPLING | [2006/34] | French: | RACCORD DE TUBE A MONTAGE RAPIDE | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 19.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.09.2010 | 14.09.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5673945 (OLSON DARWIN C [US]) [X] 6,9,12 * column 3, line 56 - column 5, line 16; figures 2,4,6 * [Y] 1-5,7,8,10,11; | [Y]US4282175 (VOLGSTADT FRANK R, et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 16 * * column 6, line 8 - line 33 * * figures 1,5,6 *; | [Y]FR2665508 (SAUSSE DANIEL) [Y] 7,8,10,11 * figures 2,4,6,7 *; | [A]US6142538 (VOLGSTADT FRANK R [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * figures 1,2,5 * | by applicant | US5673945 |