EP1699961 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING AN ELASTIC NONWOVEN WEB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | For all designated states Phoenix Intellectuals and Technologies Management, Inc. 6, Lane 213, Sec. 1, Hai-Den Road Tainan 709 / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
For all designated states Phoenix Intellectuals and Technologies Management, Inc. 6, Lane 213, Sec. 1, Hai-Den Road Tainan 709 / TW | |||
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | ||
For all designated states Phoenix Intellectuals and Technologies Management, Inc. 6, Lane 213, Sec. 1, Hai-Den Road Tainan 709 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSAI, De-Sheng 140, Pao-An Road Tainan 703 / CN | 02 /
TSAI, Te-Hsin 6, Lane 213, Sec. 1, Hai-Den Road Tainan 709 / CN | [2006/37] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2006/37] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04812979.5 | 03.12.2004 | [2006/37] | WO2004US40569 | Priority number, date | EP20030028126 | 05.12.2003 Original published format: EP 03028126 | US20040780781 | 18.02.2004 Original published format: US 780781 | [2006/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005056900 | Date: | 23.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1699961 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1699961 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/54, D04H3/16, D04H5/04, D04H13/00, D06C3/00 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
D06C3/00 (EP,US);
D04H1/54 (EP,US);
D04H1/544 (EP,US);
D04H13/00 (EP,US);
D04H3/007 (EP,US);
D04H3/16 (EP,US);
D04H5/04 (EP,US);
D04H5/06 (EP,US);
Y10T442/60 (EP,US);
Y10T442/601 (EP,US);
Y10T442/602 (EP,US);
Y10T442/637 (EP,US);
Y10T442/659 (EP,US);
Y10T442/66 (EP,US);
Y10T442/674 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/11] |
Former [2006/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ELASTISCHEN VLIESSTOFFS | [2006/37] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING AN ELASTIC NONWOVEN WEB | [2006/37] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D' UN NONTISSE ELASTIQUE | [2006/37] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/37] | 30.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/02] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.11.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 17.11.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.03.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2096048 (AKZO NV) [A] 1-39* page 4, lines 50-58 *; | [XD]US5244482 (HASSENBOEHLER JR CHARLES B [US], et al) [XD] 1 * column 4, lines 28-56 - column 9, lines 43-60; claims 1,16 *; | [A]US5582903 (LEVY RUTH L [US], et al) [A] 1-39 * column 6, line 16 - column 8, line 59 *; | [X]US5599366 (HASSENBOEHLER JR CHARLES B [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 8, line 25 - column 10, line 29 *; | [A]EP0844323 (FLEXUS SPECIALTY NONWOVENS L T [TW]) [A] 1-39 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5913997 (SCHULZ HERBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-39 * column 2, line 15 - column 4, line 65 * |