EP1694458 - TWIST DRILL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KENNAMETAL INC. 1600 Technology Way Latrobe, PA 15650 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states Kennametal, Inc. P.O. Box 231, 1600 Technology Way Latrobe, PA 15650-0231 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORSCHERT, Bernhard, W. Ignaz-Wolf-Strasse 3 96050 Bamberg / DE | 02 /
HANNA, Jerome, C. 1207 Ridgeview Drive Greensburg, PA 15601 / US | 03 /
KRIEG, Tilo Drudenweg 9a 90768 Fuerth / DE | 04 /
MEENAN, Larry, R. 1146 Chaucer Drive Greensburg, PA 15601 / US | 05 /
SHULTZ, Michael, D. 171 Countryside Lane Derry, PA 15627 / US | [2006/35] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/50] | Kitzhofer, Thomas Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/35] | Kitzhofer, Thomas Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04813182.5 | 06.12.2004 | [2006/35] | WO2004US40829 | Priority number, date | US20030738469 | 17.12.2003 Original published format: US 738469 | [2006/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005061159 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1694458 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1694458 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/00 | [2006/35] | CPC: |
B23B51/02 (EP,KR,US);
B23B51/00 (KR);
B23B2250/12 (EP,US);
B23B2251/046 (EP,US);
B23B2251/402 (EP,US);
B23B2251/50 (EP,US);
Y10T408/9097 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPIRALBOHRER | [2006/35] | English: | TWIST DRILL | [2006/35] | French: | FORET HELICOIDAL | [2006/35] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 16.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.02.2010 | BE | 17.02.2010 | CY | 17.02.2010 | DK | 17.02.2010 | EE | 17.02.2010 | FI | 17.02.2010 | LT | 17.02.2010 | NL | 17.02.2010 | RO | 17.02.2010 | SE | 17.02.2010 | SI | 17.02.2010 | SK | 17.02.2010 | BG | 17.05.2010 | GR | 18.05.2010 | IS | 17.06.2010 | [2011/07] |
Former [2010/51] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
BE | 17.02.2010 | ||
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | LT | 17.02.2010 | |
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE829568 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1-3,7,8,10-14,16-18,20 * column 3, line 7 - column 5, line 5; figures 1-5 *; | [A]SU921707 (VLADIMIRSKY POLT I [SU]) [A] 1-22* the whole document *; | [X]EP0055142 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,7,8,10-12,14,17,18,20 * page 2, line 31 - page 7, line 10 * * figures 1,7 *; | [XY]JP2000198010 (SHODA IRON WORKS CO LTD) [X] 1,2,7,8,14,17,18,20-22 * paragraphs [0006] - [0012] * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 3,4; | [X]US6261034 (CSELLE TIBOR [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,6,9,13,14,17,19,20 * column 1, line 57 - column 4, line 57 * * column 5, lines 22-52 * * figures 1,6,7 *; | [YA]US6443674 (JACONI JOHN ROBERT [US]) [Y] 4 * column 5, line 58 - column 7, line 23 * * figures 1,3 * [A] 5,21,22; | [Y]US6582164 (MCCORMICK MICHAEL R [US]) [Y] 3 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * | International search | [X]US5584617 (HOUSER DAVID E [US]); | [Y]US6443674 (JACONI JOHN ROBERT [US]); | [Y]US6582164 (MCCORMICK MICHAEL R [US]); | [Y]US2003175086 (MUHLFRIEDEL DIETER [DE], et al) | by applicant | JP2000198010 |