EP1692249 - LUBRICATING COMPOSITION CONTAINING METAL SALIXARATE AS DETERGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Lubrizol Corporation 29400 Lakeland Boulevard Wickliffe, Ohio 44092 / US | [2006/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILBY, R. Ian P.O. Box 88 Belper Derby DE56 1QN / GB | 02 /
BARR, Douglas M. 29400 Lakeland Boulevard Wickliffe, OH 44092 / US | 03 /
MCATEE, Rodney J. P.O. Box 88 Belper Derby DE56 1QN / GB | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Patentanwälte Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 04813239.3 | 07.12.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004US40895 | Priority number, date | US20030528989P | 12.12.2003 Original published format: US 528989 P | [2006/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005061682 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1692249 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1692249 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C10M163/00, C10M167/00, C10M161/00 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
C10M167/00 (EP);
C10M163/00 (EP);
C10M2205/022 (EP);
C10M2205/024 (EP);
C10M2205/04 (EP);
C10M2207/023 (EP);
C10M2207/027 (EP);
C10M2207/028 (EP);
C10M2207/144 (EP);
C10M2207/26 (EP);
C10M2207/262 (EP);
C10M2209/101 (EP);
C10M2215/28 (EP);
C10M2219/044 (EP);
C10M2219/046 (EP);
C10M2219/068 (EP);
C10M2219/082 (EP);
C10M2219/088 (EP);
C10M2219/089 (EP);
C10M2223/045 (EP);
C10M2227/061 (EP);
C10M2227/062 (EP);
C10N2010/04 (EP);
C10N2010/12 (EP);
C10N2030/42 (EP);
C10N2030/43 (EP);
C10N2030/45 (EP);
C10N2030/52 (EP);
C10N2040/25 (EP);
C10N2040/251 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C10M2215/28, C10M2215/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHMIERMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT SALIXARATMETALLSALZ ALS DISPERGIERZUSATZSTOFF | [2006/34] | English: | LUBRICATING COMPOSITION CONTAINING METAL SALIXARATE AS DETERGENT | [2006/34] | French: | COMPOSITION LUBRIFIANTE CONTENANT DE DISPERSANTS SUCCINIMIDE | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 02.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10152942.8 / EP2184338 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.02.2010 | BE | 24.02.2010 | CY | 24.02.2010 | CZ | 24.02.2010 | DK | 24.02.2010 | EE | 24.02.2010 | FI | 24.02.2010 | IT | 24.02.2010 | LT | 24.02.2010 | NL | 24.02.2010 | PL | 24.02.2010 | RO | 24.02.2010 | SE | 24.02.2010 | SI | 24.02.2010 | SK | 24.02.2010 | TR | 24.02.2010 | BG | 24.05.2010 | GR | 25.05.2010 | ES | 04.06.2010 | IS | 24.06.2010 | PT | 25.06.2010 | HU | 25.08.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
HU | 25.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | LT | 24.02.2010 | |
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO03018728 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US], et al) [DX] 1-15 * page 21, lines 1-18 * * page 23, lines 7-23 * * page 25, line 6 * * page 28, lines 9-13 * * page 30, lines 17-25 * * page 32, lines 3-7,13-19 ** claims 1-33 *; | [A]WO03040273 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-13 * * examples 1-4 * * paragraphs [0032] - [0036] * * paragraphs [0039] - [0041] * |