EP1698096 - MOBILE DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING CERTIFICATE BASED CRYPTOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.03.2010 [2010/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [2006/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELLIPADY, Guruprashanth A. 1448 Woodbury Circle Gurnee, Illinois 60031 / US | 02 /
MICHAU, Douglas T. 738 Dillon Court Grayslake, Illinois 60030 / US | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Openshaw, Paul Malcolm Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | Openshaw, Paul Malcolm Openshaw & Co. Town Hall Exchange The Town Hall Buildings Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7ND / GB | Application number, filing date | 04813522.2 | 09.12.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004US41210 | Priority number, date | US20030741510 | 19.12.2003 Original published format: US 741510 | [2006/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005065134 | Date: | 21.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1698096 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
H04L9/3268 (EP,US);
H04L2209/80 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/36] | H04L9/00, H04K1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON KRYPTOGRAPHIE AUF ZERTIFIKATBASIS | [2006/36] | English: | MOBILE DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING CERTIFICATE BASED CRYPTOGRAPHY | [2006/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF MOBILE ET PROCEDE DESTINES A FOURNIR UN CERTIFICAT A BASE CRYPTOGRAPHIQUE | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 05.02.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1117206 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,10,18 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0055]; figures 1,5 * [Y] 2-5,11-13,19,22; | [Y] - HOUSLEY RSA LABORATORIES W POLK NIST W FORD VERISIGN D SOLO CITIGROUP R, "Internet X.509 Public Key Infrastructure Certificate and Certificate Revocation List (CRL) Profile; rfc3280.txt", IETF STANDARD, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20020401), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015009058 [Y] 2-5,11-13,19,22 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * | International search | [Y]US5872844 (YACOBI YACOV [US]); | [Y]US6044462 (ZUBELDIA PEDRO [US], et al); | [YP]US2004110504 (KENAGY JASON B [US], et al); | [YP]US6775771 (SHRADER THEODORE JACK LONDON [US], et al) |