EP1697481 - BIOADHESIVE POLYMERS WITH CATECHOL FUNCTIONALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spherics, Inc. 701 George Washington Highway Lincoln, RI 02865 / US | [2006/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHESTOPOL, Marcus, A. 1832 Calvert Street NW 3 Washington DC 20009 / US | 02 /
JACOB, Jules, S. 95 Lake Ridge Drive Taunton, MA 02780 / US | 03 /
DONNELY, Ryan 1205 Hancock Street, Apartment 708 Quincy, MA 02169 / US | 04 /
RICKETTS, Thomas, L. 223 Elm Street Halifax, MA 02338-1219 / US | 05 /
NANGIA, Avinash 80 Caesar Chelor Drive Wrentham, MA 02093 / US | 06 /
MATHIOWITZ, Edith 184 Rawson Road Brookline, MA 02445 / US | 07 /
SHAKED, Ze'ev 20 Arnold Palmer Drive San Antonio, TX 78257 / US | [2007/22] |
Former [2007/12] | 01 /
SCHESTOPOL, Marcus, A. 7707 Wisconsin Avenue - 625 Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | ||
02 /
JACOB, Jules, S. 95 Lake Ridge Drive Taunton, MA 02780 / US | |||
03 /
DONNELY, Ryan 1205 Hancock Street, Apartment 708 Quincy, MA 02169 / US | |||
04 /
RICKETTS, Thomas, L. 223 Elm Street Halifax, MA 02338-1219 / US | |||
05 /
NANGIA, Avinash 80 Caesar Chelor Drive Wrentham, MA 02093 / US | |||
06 /
MATHIOWITZ, Edith 184 Rawson Road Brookline, MA 02445 / US | |||
07 /
SHAKED, Ze'ev 20 Arnold Palmer Drive San Antonio, TX 78257 / US | |||
Former [2006/36] | 01 /
SCHESTOPOL, Marcus, A. 41 Jenckes Street, Apartment 2 Providence, RI 02906 / US | ||
02 /
JACOB, Jules, S. 95 Lake Ridge Drive Taunton, MA 02780 / US | |||
03 /
DONNELY, Ryan 1205 Hancock Street, Apartment 708 Quincy, MA 02169 / US | |||
04 /
RICKETTS, Thomas, L. 223 Elm Street Halifax, MA 02338-1219 / US | |||
05 /
NANGIA, Avinash 80 Caesar Chelor Drive Wrentham, MA 02093 / US | |||
06 /
MATHIOWITZ, Edith 184 Rawson Road Brookline, MA 02445 / US | |||
07 /
SHAKED, Ze'ev 20 Arnold Palmer Drive San Antonio, TX 78257 / US | Representative(s) | Bassett, Richard Simon, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | Bassett, Richard Simon, et al Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04814021.4 | 09.12.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004US41783 | Priority number, date | US20030528042P | 09.12.2003 Original published format: US 528042 P | US20040604990P | 27.08.2004 Original published format: US 604990 P | US20040605199P | 27.08.2004 Original published format: US 605199 P | US20040605201P | 27.08.2004 Original published format: US 605201 P | US20040607905P | 08.09.2004 Original published format: US 607905 P | [2006/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005056708 | Date: | 23.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1697481 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C09J201/06, C08F8/32, C08F222/06, C08G67/04, A61K9/00 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
C08F8/32 (EP,US);
A61K9/0004 (EP,US);
A61K9/006 (EP,US);
A61K9/0065 (EP,US);
A61K9/204 (EP,US);
A61K9/2077 (EP,US);
A61K9/2081 (EP,US);
A61K9/2086 (EP,US);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C08G63/91 (EP,US);
C08G63/912 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F8/32, C08F222/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOADHÄSIVE POLYMERE MIT CATECHOLFUNKTIONALITÄT | [2006/36] | English: | BIOADHESIVE POLYMERS WITH CATECHOL FUNCTIONALITY | [2006/36] | French: | POLYMERES BIOADHESIFS A FONCTION CATECHOL | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 24.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 06.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.01.2008 | 31.12.2008 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   24.06.2009 | 31.12.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS60133078 ; | [X]EP0506979 (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,8,9,19,20 * claim - * * page 3, lines 41-55 *; | [Y]WO9321906 (UNIV BROWN RES FOUND [US]) [Y] 1-7,10,11 * example -; claims 1,2,13,14,17,18,25,26 * * page 18, paragraph 2 - page 20, line 2 * * page 27, paragraphs 2-4 *; | [XD]US5574134 (WAITE J HERBERT [US]) [XD] 1-4,8,9,12,13,17,18 * column 5, lines 31-58; claim - * * column 7, lines 43-48 * * column 13, lines 38-59 * * column 16, line 5 - column 17, line 11 *; | [XY]WO0110378 (FUNDACAO OSWALDO CRUZ [BR], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9,12,13,17,18 * example -; claim - * * page 1, lines 5-16; figures 4,7 * * page 15, line 2 - page 16, line 10 * [Y] 1-7,10,11; | [DY]US6197346 (MATHIOWITZ EDITH [US], et al) [DY] 1-7,10,11; | [X]WO03027154 (SMITH & NEPHEW [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,5-9,12-17 * examples 6-13,43; claims 1,2,9,10 * * page 6, lines 10-20 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851114), vol. 009, no. 287, Database accession no. (C - 314), & JP60133078 A 19850716 (TOKUYAMA SODA KK) [A] 1-3,5-9,12,14-17 * abstract * |