EP1694253 - INTRAOCULAR LENS IMPLANT HAVING POSTERIOR BENDABLE OPTIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quest Vision Technology, Inc. 912 Signorelli Circle St Helena, CA 94574 / US | [2006/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOODS, Randall 136 Valley Ranch Prescott, AZ 86303 / US | [2013/32] |
Former [2006/35] | 01 /
WOODS, Randall 2925 E. Page Avenue Gilbert, AZ 85234 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04814069.3 | 13.12.2004 | [2006/35] | WO2004US41839 | Priority number, date | US20030736431 | 15.12.2003 Original published format: US 736431 | [2006/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005058205 | Date: | 30.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1694253 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1694253 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/16 | [2006/35] | CPC: |
A61F2/1635 (EP,US);
A61F2/1601 (US);
A61F2/1613 (EP,US);
A61F2/1648 (EP,US);
A61F2002/1682 (US);
A61F2002/169 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/35] | Title | German: | INTRAOKULARLINSEN-IMPLANTAT MIT HINTERER BIEGBARER OPTIK | [2006/35] | English: | INTRAOCULAR LENS IMPLANT HAVING POSTERIOR BENDABLE OPTIC | [2006/35] | French: | IMPLANT DE LENTILLE INTRAOCULAIRE PRESENTANT UNE OPTIQUE FLEXIBLE POSTERIEURE | [2006/35] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 21.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 08.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.12.2004 | AT | 07.08.2013 | BE | 07.08.2013 | BG | 07.08.2013 | CY | 07.08.2013 | CZ | 07.08.2013 | DK | 07.08.2013 | EE | 07.08.2013 | ES | 07.08.2013 | FI | 07.08.2013 | IT | 07.08.2013 | LT | 07.08.2013 | MC | 07.08.2013 | PL | 07.08.2013 | RO | 07.08.2013 | SE | 07.08.2013 | SI | 07.08.2013 | SK | 07.08.2013 | TR | 07.08.2013 | GR | 08.11.2013 | IS | 07.12.2013 | PT | 09.12.2013 | IE | 13.12.2013 | LU | 13.12.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
TR | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
IE | 13.12.2013 | ||
LU | 13.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
IE | 13.12.2013 | ||
LU | 13.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
LU | 13.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 07.08.2013 | ||
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 07.08.2013 | |
PT | 09.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US4892543 (TURLEY DANA F [US]); | [X]WO0119289 (ALLERGAN SALES INC [US], et al); | [X]US4253199 (BANKO ANTON) | by applicant | US4409691 | US5674282 | US4892543 | WO0119289 | US4253199 |