EP1709276 - SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATICALLY MOVING ACCESS BARRIERS AND METHODS FOR USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WAYNE-DALTON CORP. One Door Drive, P.O. Box 67 Mt. Hope, OH 44667 / US | [2006/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MULLET, Willis, J. 525 Deer Point Drive Gulf Breeze, FL 32561 / US | 02 /
BENNETT, Thomas, B., III 3069 Briarwood Drive Wooster, OH 44691 / US | 03 /
MITCHELL, Albert, W. 3006 Harlington Place Cantonment, FL 32533 / US | 04 /
BARDIN, Richard 8391 Welcome Road Milton, FL 32583 / US | 05 /
MAMALOUKAS, Jason L 1785 E. Johnson Avenue 6 Pensacola, FL 32514 / US | [2006/52] |
Former [2006/41] | 01 /
MULLET, Willis, J. 1318 Soundview Trail Gulf Breeze, FL 32561 / US | ||
02 /
BENNETT, Thomas, B., III 3069 Briarwood Drive Wooster, OH 44691 / US | |||
03 /
MITCHELL, Albert, W. 3006 Harlington Place Cantonment, FL 32533 / US | |||
04 /
BARDIN, Richard 8391 Welcome Road Milton, FL 32583 / US | |||
05 /
MAMALOUKAS, Jason 1785 E. Johnson Avenue 6 Pensacola, FL 32514 / US | Representative(s) | Dawson, Elizabeth Ann, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/41] | Dawson, Elizabeth Ann, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 04814147.7 | 14.12.2004 | [2006/41] | WO2004US41928 | Priority number, date | US20030744180 | 23.12.2003 Original published format: US 744180 | [2006/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005066442 | Date: | 21.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1709276 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1709276 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/16, E05F15/20 | [2006/41] | CPC: |
E05F15/77 (EP,US);
E05F15/668 (EP,US);
E05F15/00 (EP,US);
E05F15/76 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/456 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/664 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/822 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/00 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/106 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/538 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN BEWEGEN VON EINFAHRTSSPERREN UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2006/41] | English: | SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATICALLY MOVING ACCESS BARRIERS AND METHODS FOR USING THE SAME | [2006/41] | French: | SYSTEME PERMETTANT DE DEPLACER AUTOMATIQUEMENT DES BARRIERES D'ACCES ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION DE CE SYSTEME | [2006/41] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 30.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.06.2008 | BE | 25.06.2008 | CY | 25.06.2008 | CZ | 25.06.2008 | DK | 25.06.2008 | EE | 25.06.2008 | FI | 25.06.2008 | IT | 25.06.2008 | LT | 25.06.2008 | NL | 25.06.2008 | RO | 25.06.2008 | SI | 25.06.2008 | SK | 25.06.2008 | TR | 25.06.2008 | BG | 25.09.2008 | GR | 26.09.2008 | ES | 06.10.2008 | IS | 25.10.2008 | PT | 25.11.2008 | IE | 14.12.2008 | LU | 14.12.2008 | HU | 26.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
BE | 25.06.2008 | ||
CY | 25.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2008 | ||
DK | 25.06.2008 | ||
EE | 25.06.2008 | ||
FI | 25.06.2008 | ||
IT | 25.06.2008 | ||
LT | 25.06.2008 | ||
NL | 25.06.2008 | ||
RO | 25.06.2008 | ||
SI | 25.06.2008 | ||
SK | 25.06.2008 | ||
TR | 25.06.2008 | ||
BG | 25.09.2008 | ||
ES | 06.10.2008 | ||
IS | 25.10.2008 | ||
PT | 25.11.2008 | ||
IE | 14.12.2008 | ||
LU | 14.12.2008 | ||
HU | 26.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
BE | 25.06.2008 | ||
CY | 25.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2008 | ||
DK | 25.06.2008 | ||
EE | 25.06.2008 | ||
FI | 25.06.2008 | ||
IT | 25.06.2008 | ||
LT | 25.06.2008 | ||
NL | 25.06.2008 | ||
RO | 25.06.2008 | ||
SI | 25.06.2008 | ||
SK | 25.06.2008 | ||
BG | 25.09.2008 | ||
ES | 06.10.2008 | ||
IS | 25.10.2008 | ||
PT | 25.11.2008 | ||
IE | 14.12.2008 | ||
LU | 14.12.2008 | ||
HU | 26.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
BE | 25.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2008 | ||
DK | 25.06.2008 | ||
EE | 25.06.2008 | ||
FI | 25.06.2008 | ||
IT | 25.06.2008 | ||
LT | 25.06.2008 | ||
NL | 25.06.2008 | ||
RO | 25.06.2008 | ||
SI | 25.06.2008 | ||
SK | 25.06.2008 | ||
BG | 25.09.2008 | ||
ES | 06.10.2008 | ||
IS | 25.10.2008 | ||
PT | 25.11.2008 | ||
IE | 14.12.2008 | ||
LU | 14.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
BE | 25.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2008 | ||
DK | 25.06.2008 | ||
EE | 25.06.2008 | ||
FI | 25.06.2008 | ||
IT | 25.06.2008 | ||
LT | 25.06.2008 | ||
NL | 25.06.2008 | ||
RO | 25.06.2008 | ||
SI | 25.06.2008 | ||
SK | 25.06.2008 | ||
BG | 25.09.2008 | ||
ES | 06.10.2008 | ||
IS | 25.10.2008 | ||
PT | 25.11.2008 | ||
IE | 14.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
BE | 25.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2008 | ||
DK | 25.06.2008 | ||
EE | 25.06.2008 | ||
FI | 25.06.2008 | ||
IT | 25.06.2008 | ||
LT | 25.06.2008 | ||
NL | 25.06.2008 | ||
RO | 25.06.2008 | ||
SI | 25.06.2008 | ||
SK | 25.06.2008 | ||
BG | 25.09.2008 | ||
ES | 06.10.2008 | ||
IS | 25.10.2008 | ||
PT | 25.11.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
BE | 25.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2008 | ||
DK | 25.06.2008 | ||
EE | 25.06.2008 | ||
FI | 25.06.2008 | ||
LT | 25.06.2008 | ||
NL | 25.06.2008 | ||
RO | 25.06.2008 | ||
SI | 25.06.2008 | ||
SK | 25.06.2008 | ||
BG | 25.09.2008 | ||
ES | 06.10.2008 | ||
IS | 25.10.2008 | ||
PT | 25.11.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
BE | 25.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2008 | ||
DK | 25.06.2008 | ||
EE | 25.06.2008 | ||
FI | 25.06.2008 | ||
LT | 25.06.2008 | ||
NL | 25.06.2008 | ||
RO | 25.06.2008 | ||
SI | 25.06.2008 | ||
SK | 25.06.2008 | ||
BG | 25.09.2008 | ||
ES | 06.10.2008 | ||
IS | 25.10.2008 | ||
PT | 25.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
BE | 25.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2008 | ||
DK | 25.06.2008 | ||
EE | 25.06.2008 | ||
FI | 25.06.2008 | ||
LT | 25.06.2008 | ||
NL | 25.06.2008 | ||
RO | 25.06.2008 | ||
SI | 25.06.2008 | ||
SK | 25.06.2008 | ||
ES | 06.10.2008 | ||
IS | 25.10.2008 | ||
PT | 25.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
BE | 25.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2008 | ||
DK | 25.06.2008 | ||
FI | 25.06.2008 | ||
LT | 25.06.2008 | ||
NL | 25.06.2008 | ||
RO | 25.06.2008 | ||
SI | 25.06.2008 | ||
SK | 25.06.2008 | ||
ES | 06.10.2008 | ||
IS | 25.10.2008 | ||
PT | 25.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
BE | 25.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2008 | ||
FI | 25.06.2008 | ||
LT | 25.06.2008 | ||
NL | 25.06.2008 | ||
RO | 25.06.2008 | ||
SI | 25.06.2008 | ||
SK | 25.06.2008 | ||
ES | 06.10.2008 | ||
IS | 25.10.2008 | ||
PT | 25.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
BE | 25.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2008 | ||
FI | 25.06.2008 | ||
LT | 25.06.2008 | ||
NL | 25.06.2008 | ||
SI | 25.06.2008 | ||
SK | 25.06.2008 | ||
ES | 06.10.2008 | ||
IS | 25.10.2008 | ||
PT | 25.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
CZ | 25.06.2008 | ||
FI | 25.06.2008 | ||
LT | 25.06.2008 | ||
NL | 25.06.2008 | ||
SI | 25.06.2008 | ||
ES | 06.10.2008 | ||
IS | 25.10.2008 | ||
PT | 25.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
FI | 25.06.2008 | ||
NL | 25.06.2008 | ||
SI | 25.06.2008 | ||
ES | 06.10.2008 | ||
IS | 25.10.2008 | ||
PT | 25.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
FI | 25.06.2008 | ||
NL | 25.06.2008 | ||
SI | 25.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
FI | 25.06.2008 | ||
SI | 25.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 25.06.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5903226 (SUMAN MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9-12,36-40,43,50-55,69-75 * column 3, line 59 - column 20, line 43; figures 1-17; claims 1-15 *; | [A]US6002332 (KING JOSEPH D [US]) [A] 1-75* column 1, line 5 - column 3, line 36; figures 1,2; claims 1-24 *; | [XA]US6271765 (KING JOSEPH D [US], et al) [X] 1-12,25,26,34-50,69-75 * column 1, line 20 - column 3, line 44; figures 1,2; claims 1-12 * [A] 13-24,27-33,51-68; | [XA]EP1176392 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,11-14,34-40,43,48-55,63-68,71-75 * paragraphs [0005] - [0008] - paragraphs [0010] - [0017] * * paragraphs [0019] , [0033] - [0073]; figures 1-5; claims 1-16 * [A] 4-10,15-33,41,42,44-47,56-62,69,70 |