EP1694659 - THIADIAZOLES AS CXC- AND CC- CHEMOKINE RECEPTOR LIGANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Corporation 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, NJ 07033 / US | For all designated states Pharmacopeia, Inc. 3000 Eastpark Boulevard Cranbury, NJ 08512 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states Schering Corporation 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | ||
For all designated states Pharmacopeia, Inc. 3000 Eastpark Boulevard Cranbury, NJ 08512 / US | |||
Former [2008/35] | For all designated states Schering Corporation 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | ||
For all designated states Pharmacopeia Drug Discovery, Inc. 3000 Eastpark Boulevard Cranbury, New Jersey 08512 / US | |||
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states SCHERING CORPORATION 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth New Jersey 07033 / US | ||
For all designated states Pharmacopeia Drug Discovery, Inc. 3000 Eastpark Boulevard Cranbury, New Jersey 08512 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIJU, Purakkattle, J. 2 Wyndham Way Piscataway, New Jersey 08854 / US | 02 /
TAVERAS, Arthur, G. 6 Joslin Lane Southborough, Massachusetts 01772 / US | 03 /
YU, Younong 280 Bromley Place East Brunswick, New Jersey 08816 / US | 04 /
ZHENG, Junying 49 Wexford Way Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | 05 /
CHAO, Jianhua 93 Lakeview Court Pompton Lakes, New Jersey 07442 / US | 06 /
AKI, Cynthia, J. 36 N. Ashby Avenue Livingston, New Jersey 07039 / US | 07 /
FINE, Jay 11 Aldon Terrace Bloomfield, New Jersey 07003 / US | 08 /
LUNDELL, Daniel 21 Sleepy Hollow Drive Flemington, New Jersey 08822 / US | 09 /
PRIESTLEY, Tony 3 Woodward Drive Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | 10 /
REGGIANI, Angelo San Raffaele Science Park, Via Olgettina 58 I-20132 Milan / IT | 11 /
MERRITT, J., Robert 14 Gloucester Lane Ewing, New Jersey 08618 / US | 12 /
BALDWIN, John, J. 621 Gypsy Hill Circle Gwynedd Valley, Pennsylvania 19437 / US | [2006/35] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04814266.5 | 16.12.2004 | [2006/35] | WO2004US42060 | Priority number, date | US20030531311P | 19.12.2003 Original published format: US 531311 P | US20030531713P | 22.12.2003 Original published format: US 531713 P | [2006/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005066147 | Date: | 21.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1694659 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1694659 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1694659 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D285/10, C07D417/12, C07D417/14, A61K31/433, A61K31/4436 | [2006/35] | CPC: |
C07D285/10 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P11/14 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P29/02 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D285/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/35] | Extension states | AL | 07.06.2006 | BA | 07.06.2006 | HR | 07.06.2006 | LV | 07.06.2006 | MK | 07.06.2006 | YU | 07.06.2006 | Title | German: | THIADIAZOLE ALS CXC- UND CC-CHEMOKINREZEPTORLIGANDEN | [2006/35] | English: | THIADIAZOLES AS CXC- AND CC- CHEMOKINE RECEPTOR LIGANDS | [2006/35] | French: | UTILISATION DE THIADIAZOLES COMME LIGANDS DES RECEPTEURS AUX CHIMIOKINES CXC ET CC | [2006/35] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 08.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.08.2008 | BE | 27.08.2008 | CY | 27.08.2008 | CZ | 27.08.2008 | DK | 27.08.2008 | EE | 27.08.2008 | FI | 27.08.2008 | LT | 27.08.2008 | NL | 27.08.2008 | PL | 27.08.2008 | RO | 27.08.2008 | SI | 27.08.2008 | SK | 27.08.2008 | TR | 27.08.2008 | BG | 27.11.2008 | SE | 27.11.2008 | GR | 28.11.2008 | IE | 16.12.2008 | LU | 16.12.2008 | IS | 27.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | PT | 27.01.2009 | HU | 28.02.2009 | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CY | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
PL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
TR | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
IE | 16.12.2008 | ||
LU | 16.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
HU | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CY | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
PL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
IE | 16.12.2008 | ||
LU | 16.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
HU | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
PL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
IE | 16.12.2008 | ||
LU | 16.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
PL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
IE | 16.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
IE | 16.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
IE | 16.12.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 27.08.2008 | |
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | LT | 27.08.2008 | |
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0099121 (BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [A] 1-94 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3309655 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-94 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0164208 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-94 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO03031440 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-94 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO03057676 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-94 * the whole document *; | [PY]WO2004033440 (PHARMACOPEIA INC [US], et al) [PY] 1-94* the whole document * |