EP1699405 - BALANCING AN INDIVIDUAL S SOUND AND LIGHT ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McNew, Barry 34 North Alamos Drive Cottonwood, AR 86326 / US | [2006/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/37] | Representative(s) | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04814609.6 | 17.12.2004 | [2006/37] | WO2004US42451 | Priority number, date | US20030530732P | 17.12.2003 Original published format: US 530732 P | US20040013778 | 16.12.2004 Original published format: US 13778 | [2007/11] |
Former [2006/37] | US20030530732P | 17.12.2003 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005058144 | Date: | 30.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1699405 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.04.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61H1/00, A61M21/00 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
A61H23/0236 (EP,US);
A61M21/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/02405 (EP,US);
A61B5/411 (EP,US);
A61H1/00 (KR);
A61B5/369 (EP);
A61B5/4035 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0142 (EP,US);
A61H2201/10 (EP,US);
A61H2230/04 (EP,US);
A61H2230/06 (EP,US);
A61M2021/0027 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSGLEICH EINES INDIVIDUELLEN S-GERÄUSCHES UND DES LICHTUMFELDS | [2006/37] | English: | BALANCING AN INDIVIDUAL S SOUND AND LIGHT ENVIRONMENT | [2006/37] | French: | EQUILIBRAGE DE L'ENVIRONNEMENT SONORE ET LUMINEUX D'UN INDIVIDU | [2006/37] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/37] | 22.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/52] | 07.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   06.02.2009 | 31.12.2009 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2010 | 31.12.2010 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2011 | 31.12.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5219322 (WEATHERS LAWRENCE R [US]) [X] 1-12 * column 1, lines 58-66 * * column 2, lines 27-43,54-62 * * column 5, lines 36-39; figure - *; | [X]US5725472 (WEATHERS LAWRENCE R [US]) [X] 1-12 * column 8, line 62 - column 9, line 31; figures 1,5 *; | [A]US2003220537 (FLUGGER RAY T [US]) [A] 1-12* paragraphs [0002] , [0010] , [0028] , [0033] - [0037]; figure - * | International search | [Y]US5304112 (MRKLAS THERESIA A [US], et al); | [A]US5727472 (BURGIO JOSEPH THOMAS [US]); | [X]US6544165 (MCNEW BARRY [US]) | by applicant | US5219322 | US5304112 | US5725472 | US6544165 | US2003220537 |