EP1709451 - REDUCING TIME TO RESULT FOR BLOOD BANK DIAGNOSTIC TESTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICRO TYPING SYSTEMS, INC. 1295 South West, 29th Avenue Pompano Beach FL 33069 / US | [2006/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALYSKA, Harry 4866 Northwest 100 Terrace Coral Springs, FL 33076 / US | 02 /
HOWARD, Paula 4399 Sunset Cay Circle Boynton Beach, FL 33436 / US | [2006/41] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/41] | Fisher, Adrian John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04814682.3 | 17.12.2004 | [2006/41] | WO2004US42531 | Priority number, date | US20030531645P | 22.12.2003 Original published format: US 531645 P | [2006/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005064347 | Date: | 14.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1709451 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1709451 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/80 | [2006/41] | CPC: |
G01N33/80 (EP,US);
Y10T436/107497 (EP,US);
Y10T436/108331 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25375 (EP,US);
Y10T436/255 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25625 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERKÜRZUNG DER ZEIT BIS ZUM VORLIEGEN VON BLUTBANKDIAGNOSTIKERGEBNISSEN | [2006/41] | English: | REDUCING TIME TO RESULT FOR BLOOD BANK DIAGNOSTIC TESTING | [2006/41] | French: | REDUCTION DU DELAI POUR LE RESULTAT D'ESSAI DIAGNOSTIQUE D'UNE BANQUE DE SANG | [2006/41] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 22.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.02.2008 | BE | 27.02.2008 | CY | 27.02.2008 | CZ | 27.02.2008 | DK | 27.02.2008 | EE | 27.02.2008 | FI | 27.02.2008 | LT | 27.02.2008 | NL | 27.02.2008 | PL | 27.02.2008 | RO | 27.02.2008 | SI | 27.02.2008 | SK | 27.02.2008 | TR | 27.02.2008 | BG | 27.05.2008 | SE | 27.05.2008 | GR | 28.05.2008 | ES | 07.06.2008 | IS | 27.06.2008 | PT | 21.07.2008 | HU | 28.08.2008 | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
TR | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
HU | 28.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
HU | 28.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
LT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
BE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 27.02.2008 | |
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0725276 (ORTHO DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document * * page 9; example D *; | [DX]US5863802 (YVES LAPIERRE [FR], et al) [DX] 1-9 * the whole document * * example 4 *; | [X] - NOVARETTI M C Z ET AL, "Comparison of conventional tube test with diamed gel microcolumn assay for anti-D titration.", CLINICAL AND LABORATORY HAEMATOLOGY. OCT 2003, (200310), vol. 25, no. 5, ISSN 0141-9854, pages 311 - 315, XP002322760 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * * page 312, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2257.2003.00540.x | [X] - BYRNE T ET AL, "A comparison of two column agglutination technologies for routine antibody screening using the indirect antiglobulin technique", BRITISH JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 53, no. 3, ISSN 0967-4845, pages 193 - 195, XP008044882 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * * page 194, column 1 * | [A] - LUHONG TANG ET AL, "A kinetic study of the synthesis of ascorbate fatty acid esters catalysed by immobilized lipase in organic media", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND APPLIED BIOCHEMISTRY, (200008), vol. 32, no. 1, ISSN 0885-4513, pages 35 - 39, XP002322761 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/BA19990109 | Examination | - LUDEWIG S.; CHANUTIN A., "FACTORS INFLUENCING THE AGGLUTINATION OF RED BLOOD CELLS, RED BLOOD CELL STROMA, AND LYMPHOCYTES", J. BIOL. CHEM, (1949), vol. 179, pages 271 - 278 |