EP1699820 - NEUTRALIZING EPITOPE-BASED GROWTH ENHANCING VACCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2012 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering-Plough Ltd. Weystrasse 20, P.O.Box 6000 Lucerne 6 / CH | [2006/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNKER, David, E. 6901 Galewood Street San Diego, CA 92120 / US | 02 /
COCHRAN, Mark, D. 4506 Horizon Drive Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [2006/37] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Casalonga, Axel, et al Bureau Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/37] | Casalonga, Axel, et al Bureau D.A. Casalonga-Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04815235.9 | 21.12.2004 | [2006/37] | WO2004US43125 | Priority number, date | US20030533719P | 31.12.2003 Original published format: US 533719 P | [2006/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005066204 | Date: | 21.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1699820 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/495 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
C07K14/475 (EP,US);
A61K38/16 (KR);
A61K38/18 (KR);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/06 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/37] | Extension states | AL | 23.06.2006 | BA | 23.06.2006 | HR | 23.06.2006 | LV | 23.06.2006 | MK | 23.06.2006 | YU | 23.06.2006 | Title | German: | WACHSTUMSFÖRDERNDER IMPFSTOFF AUF BASIS DES NEUTRALISIERENDEN EPITOPS | [2006/37] | English: | NEUTRALIZING EPITOPE-BASED GROWTH ENHANCING VACCINE | [2006/37] | French: | VACCIN STIMULANT LA CROISSANCE A BASE D'UN EPITOPE NEUTRALISANT | [2006/37] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/37] | 27.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/40] | 05.09.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.09.2012 | 12.09.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.09.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2333706 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [X]US2002127234 (EL HALAWANI MOHAMED E [US], et al); | [X]US2003065137 (BARKER CHRISTOPHER A [CA], et al); |