EP1700136 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CAPTURING IMAGES USING A COLOR LASER PROJECTION DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microvision, Inc. 6222 185th Avenue Northeast Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2011/11] |
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states Microvision, Inc. 6222 185th Avenue Northeast Redmond, WA 98052 / US | ||
For all designated states Stern, Miklos 329 Eastwood Road Woodmere, NY 11598 / US | |||
For all designated states Dvorkis, Paul 14 Tinker Bluff Court East Setauket, NY 11733 / US | |||
For all designated states Nambudiri, Narayan 37 Indian Trace Kings Park, NY 11754 / US | |||
For all designated states Wittenberg, Carl 472 Blank Lane WaterMill, NY 11976 / US | |||
For all designated states Tan, Chinh 14 Blue Top Road Setauket, NC 11733 / US | |||
For all designated states Goldman, Ron 42 Goose Hill Road Cold Spring Harbor, NY 11724 / US | |||
For all designated states Yavid, Dmitriy 22 Cedar Drive Stony Brook, NY 11790 / US | |||
For all designated states Wood, Frederick F. 8 Deering Court Medford, NY 11761 / US | |||
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. One Symbol Plaza Holtsville, NY 11742 / US | ||
For all designated states Stern, Miklos 329 Eastwood Road Woodmere, NY 11598 / US | |||
For all designated states Dvorkis, Paul 14 Tinker Bluff Court East Setauket, NY 11733 / US | |||
For all designated states Nambudiri, Narayan 37 Indian Trace Kings Park, NY 11754 / US | |||
For all designated states Wittenberg, Carl 472 Blank Lane WaterMill, NY 11976 / US | |||
For all designated states Tan, Chinh 14 Blue Top Road Setauket, NC 11733 / US | |||
For all designated states Goldman, Ron 42 Goose Hill Road Cold Spring Harbor, NY 11724 / US | |||
For all designated states Yavid, Dmitriy 22 Cedar Drive Stony Brook, NY 11790 / US | |||
For all designated states Wood, Frederick F. 8 Deering Court Medford, NY 11761 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STERN, Miklos 329 Eastwood Road Woodmere, NY 11598 / US | 02 /
DVORKIS, Paul 14 Tinker Bluff Court East Setauket, NY 11733 / US | 03 /
NAMBUDIRI, Narayan 37 Indian Trace Kings Park, NY 11754 / US | 04 /
WITTENBERG, Carl 472 Blank Lane WaterMIII, NY 11976 / US | 05 /
TAN, Chinh 14 Blue Top Road Setauket, NC 11733 / US | 06 /
GOLDMAN, Ron 42 Goose Hill Road Cold Spring Harbor, NY 11724 / US | 07 /
YAVID, Dmitriy c/o Symbol Technologies One Symbol Plaza Holtsville, NY 11742 / US | 08 /
WOOD, Frederick, F. 8 Deering Court Medford, NY 11761 / US | [2006/42] |
Former [2006/37] | 01 /
STERN, Miklos 329 Eastwood Road Woodmere, NY 11598 / US | ||
02 /
DVORKIS, Paul 14 Tinker Bluff Court East Setauket, NY 11733 / US | |||
03 /
NAMBUDIRI, Narayan 37 Indian Trace Kings Park, NY 11754 / US | |||
04 /
WITTENBERG, Carl 472 Blank Lane WaterMIII, NY 11976 / US | |||
05 /
TAN, Chinh 14 Blue Top Road Setauket, NC 11733 / US | |||
06 /
GOLDMAN, Ron 42 Goose Hill Road Cold Spring Harbor, NY 11724 / US | |||
07 /
YAVID, Dmitriy 22 Cedar Drive Stony Brook, NY 11790 / US | |||
08 /
WOOD, Frederick, F. 8 Deering Court Medford, NY 11761 / US | Representative(s) | Dendorfer, Claus, et al Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Neuhauser Straße 47 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | Dendorfer, Claus, et al Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Bayerstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/37] | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04815517.0 | 22.12.2004 | [2006/37] | WO2004US43450 | Priority number, date | US20030534005P | 31.12.2003 Original published format: US 534005 P | US20040858510 | 31.05.2004 Original published format: US 858510 | [2006/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005067316 | Date: | 21.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1700136 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/89 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
G01S7/4811 (EP,US);
G01S17/89 (EP,US);
H04N9/3129 (EP,US);
G01S7/4817 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/14] |
Former [2006/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERFASSEN VON BILDERN DURCH VERWENDUNG EINES FARBLASERPROJEKTIONS-DISPLAYS | [2006/37] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CAPTURING IMAGES USING A COLOR LASER PROJECTION DISPLAY | [2006/37] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE CAPTURE D'IMAGES AU MOYEN D'UN AFFICHEUR A PROJECTION LASER COULEUR | [2006/37] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/37] | 20.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.09.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/42] | 10.09.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.10.2013 | 01.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.10.2006 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.09.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.07.2007 | 31.12.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5708498 (RIOUX MARC [CA], et al) [X] 1-17 * column A; figures 1,3 * * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 26 * * column 5, line 49 - line 63 *; | [X]US2002100884 (MADDOCK BRIAN L W [CA]) [X] 1,4-9,17* paragraph [0008] *; | [X]US6483595 (YAKOVLEV YURII OLEGOVICH [RU], et al) [X] 1,4-9,17 * column A; figure 1 * * column 4, line 18 - line 49 * * column 6, line 20 - line 37 * * column 13, line 44 - line 57 * | Examination | US2003063775 |