Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1704186
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
09.10.2009 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] |
11.09.2009 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] |
15.05.2009 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.01.2009 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.01.2009 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 04.02.2009 [2009/06] |
02.01.2009 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.02.2009 [2009/06] |
19.12.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.12.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.09.2006 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.08.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] |
25.08.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] |
22.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.08.2006 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
05.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.02.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.11.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.07.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.07.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.03.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|