EP1704186 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS USING THALIDOMIDE FOR THE TREATMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM DISORDERS OR DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CELGENE CORPORATION 86 Morris Avenue Summit, NJ 07901 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states CELGENE CORPORATION 86 Morris Avenue Summit, New Jersey 07901 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZELDIS, Jerome, B. 157 Christopher Drive Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 02 /
SCHAFER, Peter, H. 126 John E. Busch Avenue Somerset, NJ 08873 / US | 03 /
FALECK, Herbert 19 Lakeview Drive West Orange, NJ 07052 / US | [2006/39] | Representative(s) | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04815915.6 | 27.12.2004 | [2006/39] | WO2004US43925 | Priority number, date | US20030533864P | 30.12.2003 Original published format: US 533864 P | [2006/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005065372 | Date: | 21.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1704186 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.02.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08L95/00, A61K31/00, A61K31/425, A61K31/445, A61P25/00, A61P25/28 | [2009/06] | CPC: |
A61K31/445 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/425 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/00, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/425, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/445, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/39] | C08L95/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/39] | Extension states | AL | 31.07.2006 | BA | 31.07.2006 | HR | 31.07.2006 | LV | 31.07.2006 | MK | 31.07.2006 | YU | 31.07.2006 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT THALIDOMID ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON STÖRUNGEN ODER ERKRANKUNGEN DES ZENTRALNERVENSYSTEMS | [2006/39] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS USING THALIDOMIDE FOR THE TREATMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM DISORDERS OR DISEASES | [2006/39] | French: | PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS FAISANT INTERVENIR DE LA THALIDOMIDE POUR LE TRAITEMENT ET LA PRISE EN CHARGE DE TROUBLES ET MALADIES DU SYSTEME NERVEUX CENTRAL | [2006/39] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/39] | 18.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 26.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2756737 (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR]) [X] 1-11 * examples A-C; claims 1,2 *; | [X]WO0149321 (TOBINICK EDWARD L [US]) [X] 1-11 * page 11 * * page 21 *; | [PX]WO2004096216 (SWITCH BIOTECH AG [DE], et al) [PX] 9-11* claims 7,10 *; | [X] - KIAEI M ET AL, "Thalidomide, an inhibitor of TNF alpha extends life in a transgenic mouse model of amyotrophic lateral sclerosis", ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY OF NEUROSCIENCE, XX, XX, (20031108), vol. 33rd, page Abstract450.5, XP001538763 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * | [X] - AVRAMOVICH YAEL ET AL, "Non-steroidal anti-inflammatory drugs stimulate secretion of non-amyloidogenic precursor protein", MEDLINE,, (19000101), XP002298060 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * | International search | [X]WO9517154 (ANDRULIS PHARM CORP [US]); | [X]US5434170 (ANDRULIS JR PETER J [US]) |