EP1697468 - COLORED METAL PIGMENTS, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, USE OF THE COLORED METAL PIGMENTS IN COSMETICS, AND COSMETIC CONTAINING THESE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eckart GmbH Güntersthal 4 91235 Hartenstein / DE | [2010/01] |
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states Eckart GmbH Kaiserstrasse 30 90763 Fürth / DE | ||
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states Eckart GmbH & Co. KG Kaiserstrasse 30 90763 Fürth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRÜGER, Peter Am Steinkreuz 11a 91207 Lauf / DE | [2008/28] |
Former [2006/36] | 01 /
KRÜGER, Peter Oberer Erlanger 3 91220 Schnaittach / DE | Representative(s) | Walcher, Armin, et al Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Merianstraße 26 90409 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | Walcher, Armin, et al Louis, Pöhlau, Lohrentz Postfach 3055 90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04816257.2 | 15.12.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004DE02742 | Priority number, date | DE20031061436 | 23.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10361436 | [2006/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005061630 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1697468 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1697468 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/64, C09C1/62 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
C09C1/0021 (EP,US);
C09C1/0015 (EP,US);
C09C1/62 (EP,US);
C09C1/642 (EP,US);
C09C1/66 (EP,US);
C01P2006/60 (EP,US);
C09C2200/1054 (EP,US);
C09C2200/1058 (EP,US);
C09C2220/103 (EP,US);
C09C2220/106 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEFÄRBTE METALLPIGMENTE, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG, VERWENDUNG DER GEFÄRBTEN METALLPIGMENTE IN KOSMETIKA UND KOSMETIKUM | [2006/36] | English: | COLORED METAL PIGMENTS, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, USE OF THE COLORED METAL PIGMENTS IN COSMETICS, AND COSMETIC CONTAINING THESE | [2006/36] | French: | PIGMENTS MÉTALLIQUES COLORÉS, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DESDITS PIGMENTS, UTILISATION DESDITS PIGMENTS EN COSMÉTIQUE ET PRODUITS COSMÉTIQUES AINSI OBTENUS | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 15.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.06.2010 | CZ | 30.06.2010 | DK | 30.06.2010 | EE | 30.06.2010 | FI | 30.06.2010 | IE | 30.06.2010 | IT | 30.06.2010 | LT | 30.06.2010 | NL | 30.06.2010 | PL | 30.06.2010 | RO | 30.06.2010 | SE | 30.06.2010 | SI | 30.06.2010 | SK | 30.06.2010 | TR | 30.06.2010 | BG | 30.09.2010 | GR | 01.10.2010 | ES | 11.10.2010 | IS | 30.10.2010 | PT | 02.11.2010 | AT | 15.12.2010 | GB | 15.12.2010 | LU | 15.12.2010 | BE | 31.12.2010 | CH | 31.12.2010 | LI | 31.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | HU | 01.01.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | BG | 30.06.2010 | |
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IE | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
TR | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
AT | 15.12.2010 | ||
GB | 15.12.2010 | ||
LU | 15.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
HU | 01.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BG | 30.06.2010 | |
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IE | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
AT | 15.12.2010 | ||
GB | 15.12.2010 | ||
LU | 15.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
HU | 01.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 30.06.2010 | |
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IE | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
AT | 15.12.2010 | ||
GB | 15.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
HU | 01.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 30.06.2010 | |
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IE | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
AT | 15.12.2010 | ||
GB | 15.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 30.06.2010 | |
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IE | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
AT | 15.12.2010 | ||
GB | 15.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CY | 30.06.2010 | |
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IE | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
GB | 15.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/48] | CY | 30.06.2010 | |
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IE | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/45] | CY | 30.06.2010 | |
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IE | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 30.06.2010 | |
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IE | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | CY | 30.06.2010 | |
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IE | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 30.06.2010 | |
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IE | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CY | 30.06.2010 | |
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 30.06.2010 | |
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | CZ | 30.06.2010 | |
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | EE | 30.06.2010 | |
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | FI | 30.06.2010 | |
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | FI | 30.06.2010 | |
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | FI | 30.06.2010 | |
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2313332 (MERCK PATENT GMBH) [A] 6* page 1, paragraph 3 - page 2, paragraph 2; examples 1,2; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0708154 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,16,17 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 16; examples 1-4; claims 1-10 *; | [X]WO0009617 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,11,14-17 * page 3, paragraph 4 * * page 4, paragraphs 2-4 * * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 4 * * page 7, paragraphs 3,4; example 1; claims 1-3,5,6,10 *; | [A]EP1281732 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 6,7 * paragraph [0027] * |