EP1692770 - LINEAR APPROXIMATION OF THE MAX* OPERATION FOR LOG-MAP DECODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTORS, INC. 6501 William Cannon Drive Austin, Texas 78735 / US | [2008/16] |
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTORS, INC. 6501 William Cannon Drive Austin Texas 78735 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUTZ, Gideon, c/o Motorola Israel Ltd 1 Skenkar Street Industrial Zone 46120 Herzelia / IL | 02 /
CHASS, Amir, I, c/o Motorola Israel Ltd 1 Shenkar Street Industrial Zone 46120 Herzelia / IL | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | Ferro, Frodo Nunes, et al Freescale Semiconductor Inc C/o Optimus Patents Limited Grove House Lutyens Close, Chineham Court Basingstoke, RG24 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | Ferro, Frodo Nunes, et al Freescale Semiconductor Inc c/o Impetus IP Ltd Groove House Lutyens Close Chineham Court Basingstoke, RG24 8AG / GB | ||
Former [2006/34] | Wharmby, Martin Angus Freescale Semiconductor Inc. c/o Impetus IP Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | Application number, filing date | 04816632.6 | 03.12.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004IB04420 | Priority number, date | GB20030028322 | 05.12.2003 Original published format: GB 0328322 | [2006/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005055435 | Date: | 16.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1692770 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1692770 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/45 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
H03M13/3911 (EP,US);
H03M13/37 (GB);
H03M13/45 (GB);
H03M13/6586 (EP,US);
H04L1/0055 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LINEAR-APPROXIMATION DER MAX*-OPERATION FÜR LOG-MAP-DECODIERUNG | [2006/34] | English: | LINEAR APPROXIMATION OF THE MAX* OPERATION FOR LOG-MAP DECODING | [2006/34] | French: | APPROXIMATION LINEAIRE DE L'OPERATION MAX* POUR DECODAGE LOG-MAP | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 24.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.04.2008 | BE | 16.04.2008 | CY | 16.04.2008 | CZ | 16.04.2008 | DK | 16.04.2008 | EE | 16.04.2008 | FI | 16.04.2008 | IT | 16.04.2008 | LT | 16.04.2008 | NL | 16.04.2008 | PL | 16.04.2008 | RO | 16.04.2008 | SI | 16.04.2008 | SK | 16.04.2008 | TR | 16.04.2008 | BG | 16.07.2008 | SE | 16.07.2008 | GR | 17.07.2008 | ES | 27.07.2008 | IS | 16.08.2008 | PT | 16.09.2008 | HU | 17.10.2008 | IE | 03.12.2008 | LU | 03.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | [2018/46] |
Former [2010/51] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
TR | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
GR | 17.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
HU | 17.10.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LU | 03.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
TR | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
HU | 17.10.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LU | 03.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
HU | 17.10.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LU | 03.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LU | 03.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
DE | 17.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
DE | 17.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
DE | 17.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
DE | 17.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 16.04.2008 | |
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 16.04.2008 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2002018533 (SIVAN NOAM [IL], et al); |