EP1646357 - PRO104 ANTIBODY COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diadexus, Inc. 343 Oyster Point Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2006/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAPKOFF, Jackie 4373 21st Street San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | 02 /
PILKINGTON, Glenn 6 Allara Street Rye Victoria 3941 / AU | 03 /
KELLER, Gilbert-Andre 22325 Carmelita Avenue Belmont, CA 94002 / US | 04 /
LI, Wenlu 843 Stonegate Drive South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 05 /
CORRAL, Laura 32 Marlboro Street, Belmont Massachusetts 02478 / US | 06 /
SIMON, Iris 278 Precita Avenue San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | 07 /
KMET, Muriel 576 Maybell Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 08 /
TANG, Jianwen 4888 Creekwood Drive Fremont, CA 94555 / US | [2006/16] | Representative(s) | Peebles, Katrina, et al Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London W1W 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Peebles, Katrina, et al Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street London W1U 6FQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/16] | Peebles, Katrina, et al Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street London W1U 6FQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04816759.7 | 28.06.2004 | [2006/16] | WO2004US20741 | Priority number, date | US20030485346P | 27.06.2003 Original published format: US 485346 P | US20030523271P | 17.11.2003 Original published format: US 523271 P | [2006/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005046573 | Date: | 26.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1646357 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20, C12N15/00, C12N5/00, C12N9/50, C07H21/04 | [2006/21] | CPC: |
G01N33/57415 (EP,US);
A61K47/6855 (EP,US);
A61K47/6857 (EP,US);
A61K47/6859 (EP,US);
A61K47/6869 (EP,US);
A61K49/0032 (EP,US);
A61K49/0058 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/3015 (EP,US);
C07K16/3023 (EP,US);
C07K16/303 (EP,US);
C07K16/3069 (EP,US);
G01N33/57449 (EP,US);
C07K2317/77 (EP,US);
G01N2500/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/16] | A61K6/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRO104 ANTIKÖRPER-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2006/16] | English: | PRO104 ANTIBODY COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE | [2006/16] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'ANTICORPS PRO104 ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION ASSOCIES | [2006/16] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 09.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/27] | 16.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.07.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6479274 (ANTALIS TONI MARIE [AU], et al) [X] 1-44 * column 15, line 12 - line 19 * * column 15, line 51 - line 67 * * column 18, line 45 - line 57 * * column 19 * * column 24, line 20 - line 29 * * examples 5,8; sequence ID NO 6 *; | [A] - SHIGEMASA K ET AL, "Overexpression of testisin, a serine protease expressed by testicular germ cells, in epithelial ovarian tumor cells.", JOURNAL OF THE SOCIETY FOR GYNECOLOGIC INVESTIGATION. 2000 NOV-DEC, (200011), vol. 7, no. 6, ISSN 1071-5576, pages 358 - 362, XP009075839 [A] 1-44 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1071-5576(00)00086-1 | [A] - NETZEL-ARNETT S ET AL, "MEMBRANE ANCHORED SERINE PROTEASES: A RAPIDLY EXPANDING GROUP OF CELL SURFACE PROTEOLYTIC ENZYMES WITH POTENTIAL ROLES IN CANCER", CANCER AND METASTASIS REVIEWS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DORDRECHT, NL, (2003), vol. 22, no. 2/3, ISSN 0167-7659, pages 237 - 258, XP009036432 [A] 1-44 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1023003616848 | International search | [Y]US6203979 (BANDMAN OLGA [US], et al); | [Y]US6333410 (CHARI RAVI VANKEEPURAM JAGANNA [US], et al); | [Y]US6479274 (ANTALIS TONI MARIE [AU], et al); | [Y]US2004146862 (MACK DAVID H [US], et al) |