Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007151291 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004FR50446 | 21.09.2004 | FR0350621 | 30.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007507337 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004FR50446 | 21.09.2004 | FR0350621 | 30.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1682836 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2013 | B1 | EP1682836 | 26.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004FR50446 | 21.09.2004 | FR0350621 | 30.09.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005033599 | Global Dossier | 14.04.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0350621 | 30.09.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100427862C | 22.10.2008 | C | CN1860338 | 08.11.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0350621 | 30.09.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2843447 | 06.02.2009 | B1 | FR2843447 | 13.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0350621 | 30.09.2003 |