EP1680374 - ALKYLENE CARBONATES AS WATER GLASS CURE ACCELERANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUNTSMAN PETROCHEMICAL CORPORATION 7114 North Lamar Boulevard Austin Texas 78752 / US | [2006/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLEMENTS, John, H. 8108 Miller Falls Drive Round Rock, Texas 78681 / US | 02 /
DARRAGAS, Katty Hoge Dumpel 9 B-9700 Oudenaarde / BE | 03 /
KLEIN, Howard, P. 5200 Welcome Glen Austin, Texas 78759 / US | [2006/29] | Representative(s) | Winkler, Andreas Fritz Ernst Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Winkler, Andreas Fritz Ernst Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/29] | Winkler, Andreas Fritz Ernst Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04817519.4 | 02.11.2004 | [2006/29] | WO2004US36438 | Priority number, date | US20030516825P | 03.11.2003 Original published format: US 516825 P | [2006/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005042430 | Date: | 12.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1680374 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C04B12/04 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
C03C3/076 (EP,KR,US);
C04B28/00 (KR);
C04B28/26 (EP,US);
C04B2103/10 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00215 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/26, C04B24/045, C04B24/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ALKYLENCARBONATE ALS WASSERGLASHÄRTUNGSBESCHLEUNIGER | [2006/29] | English: | ALKYLENE CARBONATES AS WATER GLASS CURE ACCELERANTS | [2006/29] | French: | CARBONATES D'ALKYLENE UTILISES EN TANT QU'ACCELERATEURS DE DURCISSEMENT A BASE DE SILICATE DE SODIUM | [2006/29] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2006 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 03.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/44] | 22.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3202214 (MCLAUGHLIN JR HOMER C); | [A]US3850650 (VON BONIN W, et al); | [A]DE10112993 (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) |