EP1702145 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A DOSING VALVE AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH C/IPE Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERLACH, Michael Reiherweg 5 71336 Waiblingen-Neustadt / DE | [2006/38] | Application number, filing date | 04817568.1 | 08.12.2004 | [2006/38] | WO2004EP53336 | Priority number, date | DE2003160891 | 19.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10360891 | [2006/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005061866 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1702145 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1702145 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20, F01N3/029, F01N11/00 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
F01N11/00 (EP,US);
F01N3/029 (EP,US);
F01N3/2066 (EP,US);
F01N2550/05 (EP,US);
F01N2610/02 (EP,US);
F01N2900/0421 (EP,US);
F01N2900/0422 (EP,US);
F01N2900/1806 (EP,US);
F01N2900/1808 (EP,US);
F01N2900/1811 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0324 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT, SE [2007/04] |
Former [2006/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES DOSIERVENTILS UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2006/38] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A DOSING VALVE AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD | [2006/38] | French: | PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE VALVE DE DOSAGE ET DISPOSITIF CORRESPONDANT | [2006/38] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 09.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6209315 (WEIGL MANFRED [DE]) [X] 1,3,6-10 * column 6, line 48 - column 7, line 18; figure 1 *; | [X]US5709080 (ARORA AMIT [US], et al) [X] 1,3,10 * column 3, line 6 - line 23; figures 1,3 *; | [A]EP1176295 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column 22, line 42 - column 24, line 44; figures 11,12 *; | [A]JP2002147223 ; | [DA]US2003033799 (SCHEYING GERD [DE]) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020904), vol. 2002, no. 09, & JP2002147223 A 20020522 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP; DENSO CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |