EP1704682 - SYSTEM FOR COMMUNICATION BETWEEN PRIVATE AND PUBLIC IP NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orange 78, rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | [2013/39] |
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states France Telecom S.A. 6, Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DALOZ, Claude 22, Hent Penn Fank Servel F-22300 Lannion / FR | 02 /
ZOUGHLAMI, Yacine 15, rue Augustine Guignedoux F-92230 Gennevilliers / FR | 03 /
FELTEN, Frédéric Rubudas F-22140 Tonquedec / FR | [2006/51] |
Former [2006/39] | 01 /
DALOZ, Claude 24, allée des Ajoncs F-22300 Lannion / FR | ||
02 /
ZOUGHLAMI, Yacine 15, rue Augustine Guignedoux F-92230 Gennevilliers / FR | |||
03 /
FELTEN, Frédéric Rubudas F-22140 Tonquedec / FR | Application number, filing date | 04817599.6 | 24.12.2004 | [2006/39] | WO2004FR03387 | Priority number, date | FR20040000425 | 16.01.2004 Original published format: FR 0400425 | [2006/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005079014 | Date: | 25.08.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1704682 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1704682 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/46 | [2006/39] | CPC: |
H04L12/4633 (EP,US);
H04L63/029 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/28] |
Former [2006/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR KOMMUNIKATION ZWISCHEN PRIVATEN UND ÖFFENTLICHEN IP-NETZWERKEN | [2006/39] | English: | SYSTEM FOR COMMUNICATION BETWEEN PRIVATE AND PUBLIC IP NETWORKS | [2006/39] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION ENTRE RESEAUX IP PRIVES ET PUBLICS | [2006/39] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/39] | 30.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/25] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.01.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 29.01.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.02.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.02.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 14.02.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.02.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.12.2004 | AT | 11.07.2018 | CY | 11.07.2018 | CZ | 11.07.2018 | DK | 11.07.2018 | EE | 11.07.2018 | ES | 11.07.2018 | FI | 11.07.2018 | IT | 11.07.2018 | LT | 11.07.2018 | MC | 11.07.2018 | NL | 11.07.2018 | PL | 11.07.2018 | PT | 11.07.2018 | RO | 11.07.2018 | SE | 11.07.2018 | SI | 11.07.2018 | SK | 11.07.2018 | TR | 11.07.2018 | BG | 11.10.2018 | GR | 12.10.2018 | IS | 11.11.2018 | IE | 24.12.2018 | LU | 24.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 24.12.2004 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PT | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
IE | 24.12.2018 | ||
LU | 24.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PT | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
IE | 24.12.2018 | ||
LU | 24.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
IE | 24.12.2018 | ||
LU | 24.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
IE | 24.12.2018 | ||
LU | 24.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
IE | 24.12.2018 | ||
LU | 24.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
IE | 24.12.2018 | ||
LU | 24.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
LU | 24.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
LU | 24.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 11.07.2018 | |
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 11.07.2018 | |
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 11.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2001023482 (WRAY MICHAEL [GB]) [A] 1-4 * figures 1,12,14-16 * * page 1, paragraphs 7-9 * * page 2, paragraph 9 * * page 3, paragraph 41 * * page 8, paragraphs 122-130 * * page 9, paragraphs 145-147 * * page 10, paragraphs 148-154 *; | [X]US6304973 (WILLIAMS TIMOTHY C [US]) [X] 1-4 * figures 1-4,6,7,13,14 * * column 3, lines 10-25 * * column 4, lines 46-52 * * column 5, lines 9-17,34-58 * * column 6, lines 42-65 * * column 7, lines 13-26 * * column 12, lines 1-10 * * column 18, lines 1-10,51-58 * * column 20, lines 19-27 *; | [A]US2002013848 (RENE SALLE MATHIAS JEAN [GB]) [A] 1-4 * figures 1-6,9-12 * * page 1, paragraphs 9-15 * * page 2, paragraphs 15-24 * * page 3, paragraph 49 * * page 4, paragraphs 62-64 ** page 6, paragraphs 77-79 * |