EP1677780 - DIETARY AND OTHER COMPOSITIONS, COMPOUNDS, AND METHODS FOR REDUCING BODY FAT, CONTROLLING APPETITE, AND MODULATING FATTY ACID METABOLISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 12th Floor 1111 Franklin Street Oakland CA 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIOMELLI, Daniele 3 Valley View Irvine, CA 92612 / US | 02 /
DE FONSECA, Fernando Rodriguez Urbanizacion Anore ta Golf, Las Mimosas no. 18 Rincon de la Victoria, 29730 Malaga / ES | [2006/28] | Representative(s) | Campbell, Patrick John Henry J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | Campbell, Patrick John Henry J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04817801.6 | 18.10.2004 | [2006/28] | WO2004US34609 | Priority number, date | US20030512471P | 16.10.2003 Original published format: US 512471 P | [2006/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005046580 | Date: | 26.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1677780 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/20 | [2006/28] | CPC: |
A61K31/164 (EP,US);
A23L33/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/16 (EP,US);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/188, A23V2200/332, A23V2250/186, A23V2250/1872, A23V2250/1874 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/28] | Extension states | AL | 04.05.2006 | HR | 04.05.2006 | LT | 04.05.2006 | LV | 04.05.2006 | MK | 04.05.2006 | Title | German: | DIETÄTISCHE UND ANDERE NAHRUNGSMITTEL, VERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG DES KÖRPERFETTS, ZUR APPETITZÜGELUNG UND ZUR MODULIERUNG DES FETTSÄURESTOFFWECHSELS | [2006/28] | English: | DIETARY AND OTHER COMPOSITIONS, COMPOUNDS, AND METHODS FOR REDUCING BODY FAT, CONTROLLING APPETITE, AND MODULATING FATTY ACID METABOLISM | [2006/28] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DIETETIQUES ET AUTRES COMPOSITIONS, COMPOSES ET METHODES DE REDUCTION DES LIPIDES DE L'ORGANISME, DE CONTROLE DE L'APPETIT, ET DE MODULATION DU METABOLISME DES ACIDES GRAS | [2006/28] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2006 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 03.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/44] | 09.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0124645 (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) [X] 1,9,10,18 * claims 1,8-10 *; | [X]WO02078746 (ALTAFFER PAULO [US], et al) [X] 1,8-10,19 * page 16, lines 1-3 * * claims 1,10,12 *; | [A]WO02080860 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * page 4, line 1 - line 17 ** page 35, line 10 - line 31 *; | [PX]WO2004045307 (NATURAL ASA [NO], et al) [PX] 1-13,19,21,22 * page 1, line 11 - page 16, line 8 * * page 19, line 5 - line 15 * * claims 1-46 * | International search | [X]US5679667 (DELLA VALLE FRANCESCO [IT], et al); | [Y]US5985282 (HAVESON BRIAN [US]); | [Y]US2003041340 (CRAVATT BENJAMIN F [US]) |